EP3701298 - EXPOSED-LENS RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING COLOR LAYERS COMPRISING BI-LAYER STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Daniel J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
STAY, Matthew S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MCCOY, Michael A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CHEN-HO, Kui 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
BUCKANIN, Richard S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18871045.3 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57544 | Priority number, date | US201762578343P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762578343 P | US201862675010P | 22.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862675010 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084287 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701298 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/12, G02B3/00, B32B5/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
A41D13/01 (US);
G02B5/22 (EP);
G02B5/201 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G02B5/12, G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | RÜCKTRAHLENDER ARTIKEL MIT BELICHTETER LINSE, DER FARBSCHICHTEN MIT ZWEISCHICHTSTRUKTUREN ENTHÄLT | [2020/36] | English: | EXPOSED-LENS RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING COLOR LAYERS COMPRISING BI-LAYER STRUCTURES | [2020/36] | French: | ARTICLE RÉTRORÉFLÉCHISSANT À LENTILLE EXPOSÉE COMPRENANT DES COUCHES COLORÉES COMPRENANT DES STRUCTURES BICOUCHES | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 19.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4763985 (BINGHAM WALLACE K [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,13-15 * col. 3, lin. 59 to col. 4, lin. 58; col. 5, lin. 5-10, 58-59; col. 6, lin. 12-16; col. 7, lin. 17 to col. 8, lin. 33;; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 1,8,15 [I] 2-4,8,11,12; | [XYI]EP0697042 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * p. 2, lin. 5-6; p. 3, lin. 16-17; p. 4, lin. 38; p. 3, l. 55; p. 7, lin. 12-26;; figures 1, 4 * [Y] 1 [I] 3,4,8,11,12; | [A]US5866236 (FAYKISH LYNN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [XI]US2012019607 (DUNN DOUGLAS S [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0042] , [ 0106]; figures 1,9,13 * [I] 3,4,8,11,12; | [Y]US2017276844 (MCCOY MICHAEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,15* paragraphs [0001] , [ 0017] , [ 0018] , [ 0056] , [ 0108]; figures 3, 4 * | International search | [A]US2001030811 (KASAI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-22* See claims 1-14. *; | [Y]US6361850 (BILLINGSLEY BRITTON G [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * See columns 5, 7, claims 1, 2, 9 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2005162742 (FLEMING ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1-8 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2017192142 (NIWAS SHRI [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1-14 and figures 1-6. *; | [Y]US2017276844 (MCCOY MICHAEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0043], [0076], [0154]-[0161], claims 2, 3, 18 and figures 1-5D. * |