EP3702393 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR LOW INCLUSION RATE POLYROTAXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM Inc. 6-2-3, Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Katsunari c/o ASM INC. 6-2-3, Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18871261.6 | 23.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018JP39267 | Priority number, date | JP20170205554 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017205554 | [2020/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019082869 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702393 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/08, C08B37/16, C08G65/32, C08G83/00, C08L5/16, C08L71/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C08G83/007 (EP);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08G65/32 (EP);
C08G65/3331 (EP);
C08G65/33317 (EP);
C08L5/16 (EP);
C08L71/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L5/16, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L71/02, C08L5/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/36] | C08G65/08, C08B37/16, C08G65/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POLYROTAXAN MIT NIEDRIGER EINSCHLUSSGESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2020/36] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR LOW INCLUSION RATE POLYROTAXANE | [2020/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYROTAXANE À FAIBLE TAUX D'INCLUSION | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2020 | Translation filed | 07.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L]US2017267646 (LIU WENZHENG [CN], et al); | [L]WO2020114396 (NINGBO INLIGHT TECH LTD [CN]); | International search | [A]WO2012081429 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* , *; | [A]WO2016111353 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP3475252B | WO2006111353 | JP2010159313 | JP5051491B | - Macromolecules, (19930000), vol. 26, pages 5698 - 5703 |