EP3701436 - DEEP REINFORCEMENT LEARNING FRAMEWORK FOR CHARACTERIZING VIDEO CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ruxin c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo California 94404 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Naveen c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo California 94404 / US | 03 /
LI, Haoqi c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo California 94404 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18871311.9 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57573 | Priority number, date | US201762577970P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577970 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084308 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701436 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08, // G06N3/04 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/006 (EP,US);
G06V20/41 (US);
G06V40/161 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | TIEFENVERSTÄRKUNGSLERNRAHMEN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON VIDEOINHALTEN | [2020/36] | English: | DEEP REINFORCEMENT LEARNING FRAMEWORK FOR CHARACTERIZING VIDEO CONTENT | [2020/36] | French: | CADRE D'APPRENTISSAGE DE RENFORCEMENT PROFOND PERMETTANT DE CARACTÉRISER UN CONTENU VIDÉO | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Goren Gordon ET AL, "Affective Personalization of a Social Robot Tutor for Children's Second Language Skills", AAAI'16: Proceedings of the Thirtieth AAAI Conference on Artificial Intelligence, (20160212), URL: https://jakory.com/static/papers/Gordon_AAAI2016_SAR.pdf, (20201105), XP055747275 [X] 1,5-7,9,13-15 * abstract * * page 2 - page 6; figures 1, 4 * [I] 2-4,8,10-12 | [A] - RAO YONGMING ET AL, "Attention-Aware Deep Reinforcement Learning for Video Face Recognition", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20171022), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.424, pages 3951 - 3960, XP033283267 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.424 | [A] - Pooya Rezvani Khorrami, "HOW DEEP LEARNING CAN HELP EMOTION RECOGNITION", Ph.D. DISSERTATION, Urbana, Illinois, (20170329), URL: https://www.ideals.illinois.edu/bitstream/handle/2142/97284/KHORRAMI-DISSERTATION-2017.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20201105), XP055747261 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2014108309 (FRANK ARI M [IL], et al) [Y] 1-24* entire document (especially para [0216], [0307]-[0308], [0314]-[0316], [0363]). *; | [Y]US2017178346 (FERRO MICHAEL W [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * entire document (especially para [0029]-[0030], [0034]) * |