EP3702336 - OPTICAL GLASS, AND OPTICAL ELEMENT, CEMENTED LENS, OPTICAL SYSTEM, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIDE Tetsuya c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18871384.6 | 18.04.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018JP16041 | Priority number, date | JP20170208104 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017208104 | [2020/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019082419 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702336 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702336 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/21, C03C3/062, C03C3/064, C03C3/066, G02B1/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
G02B1/002 (EP);
C03C3/21 (EP,CN,US);
C03C3/17 (US);
C03C3/062 (CN);
C03C3/064 (CN);
C03C3/066 (EP,CN);
C03C3/19 (US);
G02B1/00 (CN,US);
G02B3/0012 (EP);
G03B17/14 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES GLAS UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT, ZEMENTIERTE LINSE, OPTISCHES SYSTEM, AUSTAUSCHBARE LINSE FÜR KAMERA UND OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/36] | English: | OPTICAL GLASS, AND OPTICAL ELEMENT, CEMENTED LENS, OPTICAL SYSTEM, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE USING SAME | [2020/36] | French: | VERRE OPTIQUE, ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, LENTILLE CIMENTÉE, SYSTÈME OPTIQUE, LENTILLE INTERCHANGEABLE D'APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE UTILISANT LEDIT VERRE OPTIQUE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2020 | Translation filed | 24.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24165287.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2504515 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1-18 * page 5; example page 5 *; | [XA]JPH0383836 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-12 * machine translated document;; examples 26,27; table 1 *[A] 13-18; | [XA]JPH11139847 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al) [X] 1-12 * machine translated document;; example 1; table 1 * [A] 13-18 | International search | [XY]JPS46003462B [X] 1-10, 12-14 * , * [Y] 11, 15-18; | [XY]US3328181 (WEIDEL ROBERT A) [X] 1-10, 12-14 * , Column 1 lines 9 - 12, Column 2 lines 7 - 16, Examples S - U * [Y] 11, 15-18; | [Y]JP2011073934 (OHARA KK) [Y] 11 * , *; | [Y]WO2015093280 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [Y] 15-18* , [0001], [0064], [0272], [3] & US 2016/0304390 A1 [0001] - [0002], [0073], [0293], Fig.3 & CN 105814460 A & KR 10-2016-0100297 A *; | [XY] - Ogawa, Hiroshi; Ogawa, Shinaga, "7. Optical Glass", Data Book of Glass Composition, (19910325), pages 83 - 108, XP009520547 [X] 1-10, 12-14 [Y] 11, 15-18 | by applicant | JP2006219365 | JP2017208104 |