EP3701942 - SOLUBILIZATION OF CHLORHEXIDINE BASE, ANITSEPTIC COMPOSITION AND DISINFECTANT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Limited Liability Company "Sun Systems" Leninsky Prospect 109/1 Building Block 2 Apt. 269 Moscow 119421 / RU | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARDASH, Gennady Grigoryevich Dybenko St. Building 6 block 1 Apt. 259 Moscow 125475 / RU | 02 /
ARTEMANN, Jean-Christian 209 Avenue de Lattre de Tassigny 88500 Murcourt / FR | 03 /
RYTSAREV, Alexander Yuryevich Leninsky Prospekt 109/1 building block 2 apt. 269 Moscow 119421 / RU | 04 /
HAPKINA, Elena Nikolaevna University Avenue Building 21 block 4 apt. 83 Moscow 119330 / RU | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 18871653.4 | 07.03.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018RU00146 | Priority number, date | RU20170133879 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: RU 2017133879 | [2020/36] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019083397 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | RU | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701942 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K31/155, A61K47/10, A61K47/18, A61L2/18, A61L101/32, A61P31/02, A61K9/08, A61K9/48, A61K9/107, A61K47/34, A61P31/06 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61P31/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (KR);
A61K31/155 (EP,KR,US);
A01N33/06 (KR);
A01N33/08 (KR);
A01N33/12 (KR);
A01N37/44 (KR);
A01N47/44 (KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR);
A61K47/18 (KR);
A61K47/183 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/186 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K9/107 (EP);
A61K9/4833 (US);
A61K9/5089 (KR);
A61L2/0082 (KR,US);
A61L2/16 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | A61K9/10, A61K31/155, A61K47/10, A61K47/18, A61L2/18, A61L101/32, A61P31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | SOLUBILISIERUNG EINER CHLORHEXIDINBASE, ANITSEPTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DESINFEKTIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/36] | English: | SOLUBILIZATION OF CHLORHEXIDINE BASE, ANITSEPTIC COMPOSITION AND DISINFECTANT COMPOSITION | [2020/36] | French: | SOLUBILISATION DE LA BASE DE CHLORHEXIDINE, COMPOSITIONS ANTISEPTIQUE ET DÉSINFECTANTE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | Translation filed | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 09.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US7939488 (SCHEUING DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 4-8,14 * column 15, line 31 - line 41 * * column 22, line 9 - line 14 * * column 40, line 64 - column 42, line 10; tables XVIV-XX; compounds EEE,GGG * * claim 1 * [A] 1-3,11-13 [I] 9,10,15; | [XAI]US8933010 (SCHEUING DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,14 * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 9 * * column 15, line 65 - line 67 * * column 16, line 7 - line 8 * * column 17, line 10 - line 16 * [A] 9-13[I] 2,3,5-8,15; | [XAI]US2017128390 (CABASSI CLOTILDE SILVIA [IT], et al) [X] 4,5,8,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0148] , [0159] , [0170] , [0181] , [0203] , [0204] , [0236] , [0247] , [0302] * * paragraphs [0084] , [0114]; claim 25 * * paragraph [0112] * [A] 1-3,6,9-13 [I] 7,15 | International search | [Y]HUP9902964 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [Y] 7 * , abstract *; | [A]CN1425286 (WANG XINGYUAN [CN]) [A] 1-9; | [Y]RU2308292 (OOO URALSTINOL BIO [RU]) [Y] 3-5, 8-9 * , the claims, table 1 pr.6 *; | [Y]AU2010100972 (CHEMEQ LTD [AU]) [Y] 3-5, 8-9 * [0129], [0135] *; | [XYA]GB2533527 (BYOTROL PLC [GB]) [X] 1-2 * , the claims pclaim1-27, p.13 p.24-33, p.14 p.14-19, p.15 p.24-25, p.17 p.10, p.17 p.19, p.21 p.20-27, example 1 * [Y] 3-5, 7-9 [A] 6; | [A] - ZENG P et al., "Solubility Properties of Chlorhexidine Salts", Drug Development and Industrial Pharmacy, (20090204), vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1080/03639040802220318, ISSN 0363-9045, pages 172 - 176, XP055597305 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03639040802220318 | by applicant | DE415397 | DE2812945 | JPS6127 | JPS6125706 | EP0200607 | EP0279343 | EP0306455 | EP0406699 | DE3922232 | EP0473320 | US5116838 | EP0534501 | EP0539811 | WO9309770 | US5393516 | WO9512395 | US5449809 | RU2147032 | RU2351365 | - RUPPERT M.SCHLAGENHAUF U., "La clorhexidina en Odontologia. Aspectos generales", Quintessence (Ed. Espanola, (20050000), vol. 18, pages 12 - 23 | - FRANCH M.PASCUAL A.SANTOS A., "Colutorios en periodon-cia. Parte II", Arch Odontoestomatologia, (20050000), vol. 21, pages 471 - 87 | - AREVALO J.M.ARRIBAS J.L.CALBO L.HERNANDEZ M.J.LIZAN M.HERRUZCO R., "Guia del grupo de trabajo sobre desin-fectantes y antisepticos", Revision 1998. Medicina Preventiva, (19980000), vol. 4, pages 38 - 43 | - ALBERTOS J.M.JUNQUERA L.M.ALBERTOS M.T.OLAY S.LOPEZ- ARRANZ E., "La clorhexidina. Perspectiva actual", Ann Odontoestomatologia, (19960000), vol. 5, pages 217 - 23 | - "Disinfection mechanisms", HUGO W.B., Principles and Practice of Disinfection, Preservation and Sterilization, Blackwell, (19920000), pages 187 - 210 | - MUSTE-ATA F.M.PAWLISZYN J., "Assay of stability, free and total concentration of chlorhexidine in saliva by solid phase microextraction", J Pharm Biomedical Analysis, (20050000), vol. 37, pages 1015 - 24 | - GILBERT P.MOORE L.E., "Cationic antiseptics: diversity of action under a common epithet", J Appl Microbiol, (20050000), vol. 99, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2672.2005.02664.x, pages 703 - 15, XP002445973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2005.02664.x | - BEMIMOULIN J.P., "Recent concepts in plaque formation", J Clin Periodontology, (20030000), vol. 30, pages 7 - 9 | - JUNCO-LAFUENTE M.PBACA-GARCIA P.MESA-AGUADO F.L., "Utilizacion de la clorhexidina en la prevencion oral de pacientes de la tercera edad", Revista del Ilustre Consejo General de Colegios de Odontologos y Estomatologos de Espana, (20010000), vol. 6, pages 81 - 9 | - FARDAL O.TURNBULL R.S., "A review of the literature on use of chlorhexidine in dentistry", J American Dental Association, (19860000), vol. 112, pages 863 - 9 | - G. KARDASH et al., "Associations based on chlorhexidine and a synergistic effect", Materials of the VIII All-Russian Congress of Epidemiologists, Microbiologists and Parasit-ologists: v. 4. Moscow. Rosineks, (20020000), pages 21 - 22 | - "Solubilization of chlorhexidine in aqueous micellar solutions of nonionic surfactants", Abstracts of the XXIII All-Russian Conference ''Structure and Dynamics of Molecular Systems'', Moscow, (20160000), pages 74 - 74 |