EP3700437 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING INTO A CANCELLOUS BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CUTTING INTO A CANCELLOUS BONE | ||
[2023/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joy Medical Devices Corporation 1F., No. 63, Luke 2nd Road Luzhu District Kaohsiung City / TW | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JU, Chien-Ping 10535 Monroa Avenue Kansas City MO 64137 / US | 02 /
LIN, Jlin-Huey Chern 911 Tower Road Winnetka, IL 60093 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Yen-Chun No. 104, Xinshou St., Xinxing Dist Kaohsiung / TW | 04 /
YANG, Bing-Chen 20f.-2 No.9 Zhengxing Rd. Sanmin Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | 05 /
CHEN, Guan-Ting 10F., No 9, Fuqiang 2nd St., East Dist Tainan / TW | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/36] | 01 /
JU, Chien-Ping 10535 Monroa Avenue Kansas City MO 64137 / US | ||
02 /
LIN, Jlin-Huey Chern 911 Tower Road Winnetka. IL 60093 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Yen-Chun No. 104, Xinshou St., Xinxing Dist Kaohsiung / TW | |||
04 /
YANG, Bing-Chen 20f.-2 No.9 Zhengxing Rd. Kaohsing City / TW | |||
05 /
CHEN, Guan-Ting 10F., No 9, Fuqiang 2nd St., East Dist Tainan / TW | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18871664.1 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US56188 | Priority number, date | US201762577219P | 26.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577219 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019083784 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700437 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700437 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/14, A61B17/15, A61B17/34, A61B17/16 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/1617 (EP);
A61B17/1697 (US);
A61B17/1615 (US);
A61B17/1631 (US);
A61B17/1671 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN IN EINE SPONGIOSA | [2023/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR CUTTING INTO A CANCELLOUS BONE | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE DANS UN OS SPONGIEUX | [2023/09] |
Former [2020/36] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN IN EINE SPONGIOSA | ||
Former [2020/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CUTTING INTO A CANCELLOUS BONE | ||
Former [2020/36] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE DANS UN OS SPONGIEUX | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | LU | 17.10.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008114364 (GOLDIN MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-12 * figures 9A, 9B * [A] 3-6,8; | [X]WO2010121172 (SPINE VIEW INC [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 7 * | International search | [A]US2003208219 (AZNOIAN HAROLD M [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraph [0046] and figure 9B. *; | [A]US2010076503 (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0248]-[0256] and figures l0c-10f. *; | [Y]US2010174286 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * See paragraphs [0044], [0047] and claim 11. *; | [XY]US2013018385 (KEENE KEN [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 9-13, 18-20 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0038], [0045], claims 1, 13, 19 and figures 1, 2, 4, 5. * [Y] 3-6, 8, 14-17; | [Y]CN104546085 (SPIRIT SPINE HOLDINGS CORP INC) [Y] 3-6, 8 * See paragraph [0154], claim 15 and figures 8a, 8b. * | by applicant | US2008114364 | WO2010121172 |