EP3666630 - STRADDLED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | SADDLED VEHICLE | ||
[2020/34] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Nobuo c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Tomoyoshi c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
FUKUHARA, Yukihide c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 04 /
KANEHARA, Masatomo c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 05 /
TSUBOI, Hidekazu c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18872185.6 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018JP33722 | Priority number, date | JP20170212769 | 02.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017212769 | [2020/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019087579 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666630 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62J27/00, B62J50/21, B60W30/12, B60W50/16, B62K21/26 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
B62J50/21 (EP,US);
B60W30/12 (EP);
B60W50/16 (EP);
B62K21/26 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (US);
B60W2300/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | B62J27/00, B62K23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | SATTELFAHRZEUG | [2020/25] | English: | STRADDLED VEHICLE | [2020/34] | French: | VÉHICULE À SELLE | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/25] | SADDLED VEHICLE | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | Translation filed | 12.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE102012203642 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * [A] 4,5,8-13 [Y] 1; | [IAY]DE102006060635 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 2-4,6,7,9,10,13 * abstract * [A] 5,11,12 [Y] 1,8; | [IAY]WO2009101169 (UNIV FIRENZE [IT], et al) [I] 2-4,6,8,13 * abstract * [A] 5,7,9-11 [Y] 1,8; | [XAI]JP2016068769 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * abstract * [A] 5,7-12 [I] 2,3; | [XAI]JP2007112316 (A UN KK) [X] 1,2,12 * abstract * [A] 4-11,13 [I] 3; | [XA]US2017267171 (SWENEY ROBERT WAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-13; | [XA]DE102015215527 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-13; | [XA]EP3010791 (PRODUCT DEV TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-13; | [XA]US2017146358 (WARD RYAN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-13; | [XA]WO2016185247 (BOREAL BIKES INCORPORATED / LES BICYCLETTES BOREAL INCORPORÉE [CA]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-13; | [XAI]GB2539416 (BRIGHTSPARK GLOBAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 4-13 [I] 3; | [XAI]GB2462068 (LYALL DAVID [GB]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 4-13 [I] 3 | International search | [YA]US2017267171 (SWENEY ROBERT WAYNE [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6, 8, 11 * , * [A] 5, 7, 9-10,12; | [YA]JP2008046807 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-4, 6, 8, 11 * , * [A] 5, 7, 9-10, 12; | [YA]JPH0898305 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * , * [A] 5, 7, 9-10, 12; | [A]JP2005532559 [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]JP2012240613 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]JP2007112316 (A UN KK) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]JP2016165943 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , * | by applicant | JP5972332B |