EP3705533 - SELF-SUPPORTING HYDROGEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Gunma University 2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-8510 / JP | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKENO, Hiroyuki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8510 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Shiori c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8510 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Arisa c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8510 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18872422.3 | 05.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018JP41028 | Priority number, date | JP20170214002 | 06.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017214002 | [2020/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019088289 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705533 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/02, B01J13/00, C08J3/075, C08K3/34, C08K5/52 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C08L71/02 (EP);
C08J3/075 (EP,US);
B01J13/00 (EP);
C08G65/08 (US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/52 (EP,US);
C08J2371/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08K3/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | SELBSTTRAGENDES HYDROGEL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/37] | English: | SELF-SUPPORTING HYDROGEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/37] | French: | HYDROGEL AUTOPORTANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2020 | Translation filed | 03.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009274924 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP3070128 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-13; claims 1-15 *; | [X] - HOSSEIN A BAGHDADI ET AL, "Long-term aging effects on the rheology of neat laponite and laponite-PEO dispersions", RHEOLOGICA ACTA, SPRINGER-VERLAG, DE, (20071218), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 1435-1528, pages 349 - 357, XP019589171 [X] 1-5,8,9,14,15 * Experimental section; page 350 * * figures 2b,e * | [A] - HIROYUKI TAKENO ET AL, "Molecularweight effects on tensile properties of blend hydrogels composed of clay and polymers", POLYMER, (2016), vol. 85, pages 47 - 54, XP002800360 [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2016.01.008 | International search | [A]KR20070040173 (GKL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-5, table 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011001657 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-19 & US 2012/0101041 A1 claims 1-19 & EP 2450392 A1 *; | [A]WO2011018995 (KAWAMURA INST CHEM RES [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-14 & JP 2011-57962 A *; | [A]WO2014046136 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2015/0267007 A1, whole document & EP 2899238 A1 & CN 104755560 A & TW 201431933 A & CN 108587223 A *; | [A]WO2014046127 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2015/0274899 A1, whole document *; | [A]US2015126665 (TAKENO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2015/0152243 A1 & US 2014/0080955 A1 *; | [PX]WO2018164003 (NISSAN CHEMICAL CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6, 9, 14, 15* , claims 1-13, examples (Family: none) *; | [A] - BAGHDADI, A. HOSSEIN et al., "Long-term aging effects on the rheology of neat laponite and laponite-PEO dispersions", RHEOLOGICA ACTA, (20080000), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 349 - 357, XP019589171 [A] 1-15 | [A] - MORARIU, SIMONA et al., "Effect of Temperature and Aging Time on the Rheological Behavior of Aqueous Poly(ethylene glycol)/Laponite RD Dispersions", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (20120000), vol. 116, doi:doi:10.1021/jp208136g, pages 48 - 54, XP055555139 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp208136g | by applicant | JP2002053629 | JP2009274924 | - K. HARAGUCHI et al., Adv. Mater., (20020000), vol. 14, no. 16, page 1120 | - H. A. BAGHDADIJ. PARRELLAS. R. BHATIA, Rheol Acta, (20080000), vol. 47, pages 349 - 357 |