EP3705261 - BURR REMOVAL METHOD, AND BURR REMOVAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/37] | MOLDING PRODUCTION METHOD, MOLDING DIE, MOLDING PRODUCTION APPARATUS, BURR REMOVAL METHOD, AND BURR REMOVAL DEVICE | ||
[2022/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoraku Co., Ltd. 598-1 Tatsumae-cho Nakadachiuri-sagaru Karasumadori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-0912 / JP | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA Kengo c/o KYORAKU CO. LTD. 1-1-37 Fukaminishi Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0018 / JP | 02 /
TANJI Tadatoshi c/o KYORAKU CO. LTD. 1-1-37 Fukaminishi Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0018 / JP | 03 /
TANI Naoto c/o KYORAKU CO. LTD. 2-207 Nakaotai Nishi-Ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 452-0822 / JP | 04 /
ONODERA Masaaki c/o KYORAKU CO. LTD. 2-207 Nakaotai Nishi-Ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 452-0822 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18873254.9 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018JP40361 | Priority number, date | JP20170210994 | 31.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017210994 | JP20170237467 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017237467 | JP20180201484 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018201484 | [2020/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019088115 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705261 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705261 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/70, B29C49/50, B29C49/42, B29C37/02, // B29C49/04 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B29C37/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/50 (EP,US);
B29C49/42 (KR);
B29C49/4273 (EP);
B29C49/70 (EP,KR);
B29C49/72 (KR);
B29C2049/4807 (EP);
B29C2049/503 (EP);
B29C2049/701 (EP,KR);
B29C2049/725 (EP,KR);
B29C2793/0009 (EP);
B29C2793/0027 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP);
B29C49/42826 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (US);
B29K2023/12 (US);
B29L2023/22 (EP);
B29L2031/3032 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | B29C49/72, B29C49/50, B29C49/42, B29C37/02, // B29C49/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/37] | B29C49/72, B29C37/02, B29C49/42, B29C49/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRATENTFERNUNGSVERFAHREN UND GRATENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | BURR REMOVAL METHOD, AND BURR REMOVAL DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE BAVURES ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉLIMINATION DE BAVURES | [2022/48] |
Former [2020/37] | SPRITZLINGHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, SPRITZLINGFORM, SPRITZLINGHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, GRATENTFERNUNGSVERFAHREN UND GRATENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/37] | MOLDING PRODUCTION METHOD, MOLDING DIE, MOLDING PRODUCTION APPARATUS, BURR REMOVAL METHOD, AND BURR REMOVAL DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/37] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MOULAGE, MATRICE DE MOULAGE, APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE MOULAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE BAVURES ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉLIMINATION DE BAVURES | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | Translation filed | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23161455.3 / EP4220768 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2007276125 (KYORAKU CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 14; | [A]CN203844208U (YAPP AUTOMOTIVE PARTS CO LTD) [A] 14* figures 4-6; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US3303243 (HUGHES JOHN R, et al) [A] 18, 31* & GB 1046367 A *; | [XA]US3606113 (LICHTMAN HOWARD, et al) [X] 22, 32 * , fig. 1-5 (Family: none) * [A] 23-30; | [XA]JPS61148025 (KYORAKU CO LTD) [X] 18, 21-23, 27, 31-32 * , examples, fig. 1-7 (Family: none) * [A] 19-20, 24-26; | [Y]JPH0460612U (SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION) [Y] 22-29, 32-33 * , prior art, examples, fig. 4-5, 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]US5967010 (VAN MANEN DICK [US]) [A] 18, 31 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002292642 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) [A] 14-17 * (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2007276125 (KYORAKU CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0009]-[0039], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * [A] 14-17; | [Y]JP2009101412 (OKUYA YASUAKI, et al) [Y] 22-29, 32-33 * , paragraph [0056], fig. 8-11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016083859 (KYORAKU CO LTD) [Y] 22-29, 32-33 * , claims, paragraphs [0007], [0040]-[0043], fig. 5-9 (Family: none) * | Examination | US2002180116 | by applicant | JP2016083859 |