EP3705580 - INTRA-ORAL INSPECTION METHOD USING INFORMATION FOR BACTERIA GROUPS ASSOCIATED WITH CLINICAL INDICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GC Corporation 584-1, Nakahinata, Oyama-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 410-1307 / JP | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOGAWA Naoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
HARA Ai c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI Shinya c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 04 /
NOZAKI Takenori c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18874137.5 | 02.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018JP40917 | Priority number, date | JP20170212488 | 02.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017212488 | [2020/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019088272 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705580 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/06, C12Q1/68, G01N37/00, C12N15/09, C12Q1/689 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/06 (EP);
G01N37/00 (EP);
C12N15/09 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | C12Q1/06, C12Q1/68, G01N37/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INTRAORALEN INSPEKTION MITHILFE VON INFORMATIONEN FÜR MIT KLINISCHEN INDIZES ASSOZIIERTE BAKTERIENGRUPPEN | [2020/37] | English: | INTRA-ORAL INSPECTION METHOD USING INFORMATION FOR BACTERIA GROUPS ASSOCIATED WITH CLINICAL INDICES | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION DE LA CAVITÉ BUCCALE METTANT EN UVRE DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES À UN GROUPE BACTÉRIEN EN RELATION AVEC DES INDICES CLINIQUES | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | Translation filed | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPY]WO2018012011 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * * claims 1-15 * * examples [2-1]-[2-5] * [Y] 4; | [E]EP3483266 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,5-9 * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0121] , [0199] - [0215] - [0291] * * examples 2-2 *; | [XY] - By Chloé ET AL, "TECHNOLOGICAL ADVANCEMENTS IN MICROBIAL ANALYSES OF PERIODONTITIS PATIENTS: FOCUS ON ILLUMINA SEQUENCING USING THE MISEQ SYSTEM ON THE 16S RRNA GENE: A CLINICAL AND MICROBIAL STUDY Partial Fulfillment of the Requirements for the Degree MASTER OF SCIENCE (CRANIOFACIAL BIOLOGY)", (20130801), URL: http://digitallibrary.usc.edu/cdm/compoundobject/collection/p15799coll3/id/315306/rec/1, (20201207), XP055757001 [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 1 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 42, paragraph 2 - page 50 * * figures 4-7 * * tables 8-9 * * pages 67-68 * [Y] 4 | [XY] - SIGMUND S. SOCRANSKY ET AL, "Dental biofilms: difficult therapeutic targets", PERIODONTOLOGY 2000, DK, (20020101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1034/j.1600-0757.2002.280102.x, ISSN 0906-6713, pages 12 - 55, XP055612980 [X] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * * figures 1,7-27 * * page 43 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0757.2002.280102.x | [I] - SUSAN YOST ET AL, "Functional signatures of oral dysbiosis during periodontitis progression revealed by microbial metatranscriptome analysis", GENOME MEDICINE,, (20150427), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/S13073-015-0153-3, ISSN 1756-994X, page 27, XP021215658 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13073-015-0153-3 | [I] - HIDETAKE FUJINAKA ET AL, "Relationship of periodontal clinical parameters with bacterial composition in human dental plaque", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, Berlin/Heidelberg, (20130329), vol. 195, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s00203-013-0883-9, ISSN 0302-8933, pages 371 - 383, XP055756998 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00203-013-0883-9 | [IY] - SZYMON P SZAFRANSKI ET AL, "High-resolution taxonomic profiling of the subgingival microbiome for biomarker discovery and periodontitis diagnosis", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20150201), vol. 81, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AEM.03534-14, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1047 - 1058, XP055538161 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 1048, column 2, paragraph last - page 1049, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.03534-14 | [I] - BO LIU ET AL, "Deep Sequencing of the Oral Microbiome Reveals Signatures of Periodontal Disease", PLOS ONE, (20120604), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0037919, page e37919, XP055206046 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037919 | International search | [A]JP2004229537 (BML INC) [A] 1-9 * (Family: none) *; | [A]US2010196941 (BRAUN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * & WO 2009/018342 A1 *; | [A]JP2013505428 (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA) [A] 1-9 * & US 2010/0210023 A1 & WO 2010/034037 A1 *; | [A]JP2016104720 (SUNSTAR INC) [A] 1-9 * & US 2013/0316371 A1 & WO 2012/081306 A1 & EP 2657703 A1 & CN 103443627 A *; | [XY]JP2017085944 (LION TRADING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 7-8 * , claims, paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0034], [0040]-[0042] (Family: none) * [Y] 5-9; | [Y] - SOCRANSKY, S. S. et al., "Dental biofilms: difficult therapeutic targets", Periodontology, (20000000), vol. 28, pages 12 - 55, XP55612980 [Y] 5-9 * , fig. 1, 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0757.2002.280102.x | by applicant | JPS51882B | JPH11108928 | JP2001133453 | WO0210444 | WO03106676 | JP2004504069 | JP2004163211 | JP2004229537 | JP2007068431 | JP2007074950 | JP2008206516 | JP4252812B | JP2011193810 | JP5863035B | - SOCRANSKY, S. S. et al., J ClinMicrobiol, (19990000), vol. 37, pages 1426 - 30 | - MASATO MINABETOSHIAKI YOSHINO, Concept of Periodontal Treatment Using Bacterial Test, Igaku Joho-sha, Ltd., (20050600), page 3 | - "Clinical Guidelines for Antibacterial Therapy in Patients with Periodontal Disease", Japanese Society of Periodontology | - HIROSHI OHNOSYOHEI HATTORI, Human Health and Diseases Controlled by Indigenous Bacterial Flora, YODOSHA CO., LTD., (20140300), page 97 | - EBERHARD, J. et al., Oral Microbiol Immunol, (20080000), vol. 23, pages 21 - 8 | - SHANG, S et al., Pediatric Research, (20050000), vol. 58, pages 143 - 148 | - TOPCUOGLU, N. et al., J Clin Pediatr Dent, (20130000), vol. 38, pages 155 - 60 | - TOPCUOGLU, N. et al., Anaerobe, (20150000), vol. 35, pages 35 - 40 | - HENNE, K. et al., J Oral Microbiol, (20140000), vol. 6, page 25874 | - "Predicting Periodontitis Progression from Salivary Bacterial Test and Serum Antibody Titer Test", Journal of the Japanese Society of Periodontology, (20160000), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 254 - 258 | - "Possibility of Bacterial Test in Periodontal Disease", Journal of the Japanese Society of Periodontology, (20130000), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 294 - 299 | - HAFFAJEE ADSOCRANSKY SS., "Microbial etiological agents of destructive periodontal diseases", Periodontol 2000, (19940600), vol. 5, pages 78 - 111 | - Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 467 - 470 | - Science, (19910000), vol. 251, pages 767 - 773 | - SOCRANSKY, S. S. et al., J Clin Microbiol, (19990000), vol. 37, pages 1426 - 30 |