EP3704248 - METHODS AND KITS FOR TARGETED ENRICHMENT OF TARGET DNA WITH HIGH GC CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berry Genomics Co., Ltd Room 801, Floor 8, Building No. 5, Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | [2022/43] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Berry Genomics Co., Ltd. Room 801, Floor 8, Building No. 5, Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QU, Ziwei Room 801 Floor 8 Building No. 5 Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park, Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | 02 /
YU, Tao Room 801 Floor 8 Building No. 5 Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park, Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Fangming Room 801 Floor 8 Building No. 5 Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park, Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Nannan Room 801 Floor 8 Building No. 5 Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park, Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Jianguang Room 801 Floor 8 Building No. 5 Yard 4 Shengmingyuan Road Science Park, Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18874699.4 | 07.02.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018CN75543 | Priority number, date | CN20171170776 | 03.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711070776 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019085320 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704248 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3704248 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6834, C12Q1/6827 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP);
C12Q1/6834 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q2537/159 (US);
C12Q2565/519 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2537/159, C12Q2565/519 (EP);
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2521/514, C12Q2525/151, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2531/119, C12Q2565/518 (EP);
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2521/514, C12Q2525/151, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2531/119, C12Q2565/518 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR GEZIELTEN ANREICHERUNG VON ZIEL-DNA MIT HOHEM GC-GEHALT | [2020/37] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR TARGETED ENRICHMENT OF TARGET DNA WITH HIGH GC CONTENT | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET KITS D'ENRICHISSEMENT CIBLÉ D'ADN CIBLE AVEC UNE TENEUR EN GC ÉLEVÉE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IE | 07.02.2023 | LU | 07.02.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IE | 07.02.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IE | 07.02.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008097887 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; example 1 *; | [A]WO2010127020 (JS GENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1A; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2016028887 (PACIFIC BIOSCIENCES CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0100] , [ 129] * | International search | [X]WO2014113204 (PERSONALIS INC [US]) [X] 1-16* see claims 6, 8, 26, 34, 47, 54 and 60, description, paragraphs [0083], [0132], [0154] and [0165] * | by applicant | WO2008097887 | WO2010127020 | WO2016028887 | - JIA QWU HZHOU X et al., "A ''GC-rich'' method for mammalian gene expression: a dominant role of non-coding DNA GC content in regulation of mammalian gene expression", Sci China Life Sci., (20100000), vol. 53, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s11427-010-0003-x, pages 94 - 100, XP035977679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11427-010-0003-x | - HUANG WXIA QLUO S et al., "Distribution of fragile X mental retardation 1 CGG repeat and flanking haplotypes in a large Chinese population", Mol Genet Genomic Med., (20150000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 172 - 181 | - CHEN XWANG JXIE H et al., "Fragile X syndrome screening in Chinese children with unknown intellectual developmental disorder", BMC Pediatr., (20150000), vol. 15, doi:10.1186/s12887-015-0394-8, page 77, XP021225928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12887-015-0394-8 | - KIELECZAWA J., "Fundamentals of sequencing of difficult templates---an overview", J Biomol Tech., (20060000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 207 - 217 | - HUBE FREVERDIAU PIOCHMANN SGRUEL Y, "Improved PCR method for amplification of GC-rich DNA sequences", Mol Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1385/MB:31:1:081, pages 81 - 84, XP002684995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:31:1:081 | - LI LYLI QYU YH et al., "A primer design strategy for PCR amplification of GC-rich DNA sequences", Clin Biochem., (20110000), vol. 44, no. 8-9, doi:10.1016/j.clinbiochem.2011.02.001, pages 692 - 698, XP028209462 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clinbiochem.2011.02.001 | - JENSEN MAFUKUSHIMA MDAVIS RW, "DMSO and betaine greatly improve amplification of GC-rich constructs in de novo synthesis", PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0011024, page e11024, XP055265247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0011024 | - STRIEN JSANFT JMALL G, "Enhancement of PCR amplification of moderate GC-containing and highly GC-rich DNA sequences", Mol Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 1048 - 1054 | - LOOMIS EW, EID JS, PELUSO P, ET AL., "Sequencing the unsequenceable: expanded CGG-repeat alleles of the fragile X gene.", Genome Res., (20130000), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1101/gr.141705.112, pages 121 - 128, XP055266158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.141705.112 | - SCHADT EETURNER SKASARSKIS A, "A window into third-generation sequencing", Hum. Mol. Genet., (20100000), vol. 19, no. R2, doi:10.1093/hmg/ddq416, pages R227 - R240, XP055223002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddq416 | - PHAM TTYIN JEID JS et al., "Single-locus enrichment without amplification for sequencing and direct detection of epigenetic modifications", Mol Genet Genomics, (20160000), vol. 291, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00438-016-1167-2, pages 1491 - 1504, XP035882129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00438-016-1167-2 | - "Target Enrichment via DNA Hybridization Capture. In: Shapiro B.", HORN S, Methods in Molecular Biology (Methods and Protocols), Humana Press, (20120000), vol. 840 | - DEAN FBHOSONO SFANG L et al., "Comprehensive human genome amplification using multiple displacement amplification", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20020000), vol. 99, no. 8, doi:10.1073/pnas.082089499, pages 5261 - 5266, XP002297504 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.082089499 | CN20108032511 |