EP3740809 - INTERACTIVE AUGMENTED OR VIRTUAL REALITY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vrgineers, Inc. 8 Green Ste. R Dover, Delaware 19901 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLCAK, Marek Zelinky 7 62100 Brno / CZ | 02 /
KOSTILEK, Milan Skolni 69 36225 Nova Role / CZ | 03 /
CHLOUPEK, Martin Plzenska 770/58 15000 Praha 5 / CZ | 04 /
JIRINEC, Tomas Namesti Jiriho z Lobkovic 1 13000 Praha 3 / CZ | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Sedlák, Jirí Dukelskych hrdinu 12 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Sedlák, Jirí Okruzni 2824 370 01 Ceské Budejovice / CZ | Application number, filing date | 18874899.0 | 31.10.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018US58533 | Priority number, date | US201762580203P | 01.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762580203 P | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089811 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740809 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06F3/00, G06F3/01, G06T19/00, G09G5/00, H04N13/20, G02B27/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,IL,US);
G02B27/0172 (IL,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,IL,US);
G02B27/0955 (IL,US);
G06T19/006 (IL,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,IL,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,IL,US);
G02B2027/0181 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,IL,US);
G02B5/208 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | G02B27/01, G06F3/00, G06F3/01, G06T19/00, G09G5/00, H04N13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIVE VORRICHTUNGEN DER ERWEITERTEN ODER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT | [2020/48] | English: | INTERACTIVE AUGMENTED OR VIRTUAL REALITY DEVICES | [2020/48] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE OU VIRTUELLE INTERACTIVE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/48] | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011169928 (GASSEL JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]CN105700140 (BEIJING STAR WANYOU TECH CO LTD); | [Y]US2017160798 (LANMAN DOUGLAS ROBERT [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2009262074 (NASIRI STEVEN S [US], et al); | [XY]US2011169928 (GASSEL JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2013077049 (BOHN DAVID D [US]); | [X]US2013335573 (FORUTANPOUR BABAK [US], et al); | [Y]US8786675 (DEERING MICHAEL F [US]); | [A]US2014306866 (MILLER SAMUEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US2015038227 (LOOSE TIMOTHY C [US], et al); | [A]US8965460 (RAO SUNIL K [US], et al); | [Y]US2016198949 (SPITZER MARK B [US]); | [Y]US2017161951 (FIX ALEXANDER JOBE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011169928 | CN105700140 | US2017160798 |