EP3708863 - ANTI-VIBRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prospira Corporation 580, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki city Kanagawa prefecture 212-0013 / JP | [2022/33] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI Tadashi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
ABE Yukiko c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI Kenichirou c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 04 /
KOBAYASHI Masato c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 05 /
YASUI Kei c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/38] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18875188.7 | 06.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018JP41213 | Priority number, date | JP20170214892 | 07.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017214892 | [2020/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019093337 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708863 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708863 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/38, B60K5/12, F16F15/08 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B60K5/1208 (EP,US);
F16F3/093 (US);
B60K5/12 (EP);
B60K5/1216 (EP);
B60K5/1225 (EP);
F16F1/3849 (EP);
F16F15/08 (US);
F16F1/38 (EP);
F16F2224/02 (US);
F16F2224/0208 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2020/38] | English: | ANTI-VIBRATION DEVICE | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-VIBRATIONS | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | Translation filed | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
IT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07158674 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [A]DE102012014477 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]JPH07280034 (BRIDGESTONE CORP, et al) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0043], fig. 1-7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH1082442 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8* , paragraph [0008], fig. 1-6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007127239 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-8 * , fig. 1-8 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH1082442 | JP2000337443 |