EP3706698 - A CONVEYANCE FOR SURMOUNTING OBSTACLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orbilift Pty Ltd 20 George St Level 3, Suite 4 Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Victor c/o Suite 4 Level 3 20 George St Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Sessford, Russell Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Hamilton, Alistair AHIP PO Box 8001 Kirkcudbright DG6 9AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18875878.3 | 28.09.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018AU51065 | Priority number, date | AU20170904562 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: AU 2017904562 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019090385 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706698 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/06, B62D57/02, A61G5/10, A61G5/04, F16H3/44 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B62D57/028 (EP,IL);
A61G5/061 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
A61G5/022 (AU,IL,US);
A61G5/027 (IL,KR);
A61G5/04 (AU,IL,KR,US);
A61G5/042 (EP,IL);
A61G5/045 (EP,IL);
A61G5/046 (EP,IL);
A61G5/068 (AU,IL);
A61G5/104 (IL,KR);
A61G5/1056 (AU,IL);
A61G5/1059 (AU,IL,KR,US);
A61G5/107 (EP,AU,IL,KR);
A61G5/1072 (EP,IL);
A61G5/1078 (EP,IL);
A61G5/1091 (IL,KR);
F16H1/2809 (AU,IL);
F16H1/46 (AU,IL);
A61G2200/34 (IL,KR);
A61G2203/14 (EP,IL,KR);
A61G2203/22 (AU,IL);
A61G2203/30 (AU,IL,US);
A61G2203/70 (EP,IL);
B60B2900/551 (AU,IL);
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | A61G5/06, B62D57/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWINDUNG VON HINDERNISSEN | [2020/38] | English: | A CONVEYANCE FOR SURMOUNTING OBSTACLES | [2020/38] | French: | MOYEN DE TRANSPORT POUR SURMONTER DES OBSTACLES | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2014234137 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-5,7,9,12-15 * figures 1-10 * * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0045] * * the whole document *[I] 6,8,10,11 | International search | [A]US3241848 (FLORY JOHN F) [A] 1-17 * Whole document *; | [A]US5701965 (KAMEN DEAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-17* Whole document *; | [XA]KR101188862B (AICT) [X] 1-4, 7, 11-14, 16, 17 * Fig. 4-17; Para [0025, 0039, 0047-0050] Whole document * [A] 5, 6, 8-10, 15; | [A]US2015272793 (LU CLIVE [US]) [A] 1-17 * Whole document *; | [XA]US2016251044 (KLASSEN JAMES BRENT [CA]) [X] 1, 4, 7, 8, 11, 14-17 * Fig. 1-16, 24-30; Para [0085-0088, 0093, 0095, 0117, 0119] Whole document * [A] 2, 3, 5, 6, 9, 10, 12, 13; | [X] - Robotic wheelchair from Chiba Tech turns wheels into legs and climbs over steps #Diglnfo, (20121014), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=t2SHKyq5yCU, (20180118), XP054979530 [X] 1-17 * Whole video * | by applicant | JP2014234137 |