EP3688703 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXECUTION OF ATOMIC TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Asset (Switzerland) GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 40 8050 Zurich / CH | [2021/18] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Digital Asset (Switzerland) Gmbh Luggwegstrasse 9 8048 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARANIECKI, Walter Eric c/o Digital Asset Holdings LLC 96 Spring Street 8th Floor New York NY 10012 / US | 02 /
MATHIESON, Kelly Anne c/o Digital Asset Holdings LLC 96 Spring Street 8th Floor New York NY 10012 / US | 03 /
VEPREK, Ratko Goran c/o Digital Asset (Switzerland) GMBH Luggwegstrasse 9 8048 Zurich / CH | 04 /
SJOEDIN, Johan c/o Digital Asset (Switzerland) GMBH Luggwegstrasse 9 8048 Zurich / CH | 05 /
YEH, Charng-Ching c/o Digital Asset Holdings LLC 96 Spring Street 8th Floor New York NY 10012 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18876657.0 | 09.11.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US60132 | Priority number, date | US201762584227P | 10.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762584227 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019094797 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688703 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/02, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/38, G06F16/23, G06Q20/36, G06Q20/10, G06Q20/22 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/3829 (US);
G06F16/2343 (US);
G06F16/2365 (EP,US);
G06F16/2379 (EP);
G06F21/6227 (US);
G06F9/52 (US);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/10 (EP);
G06Q20/223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3823 (EP);
H04L9/0637 (US);
H04L9/0643 (US);
G06Q2220/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | G06Q20/02, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON ATOMAREN TRANSAKTIONEN | [2020/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXECUTION OF ATOMIC TRANSACTIONS | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À UNE EXÉCUTION DE TRANSACTIONS ATOMIQUES | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN105573828 (BUBI (BEIJING) NETWORK TECH CO LTD); | [I]CN107085810 (HAOGANG ZHU, et al) | International search | [A]US2015026072 (ZHOU ANDREW H B [US], et al); | [A]US2015287026 (YANG DANNY [US], et al); | [X]US2016292680 (WILSON JR DONALD R [US], et al); | [A]US2016321751 (CREIGHTON IV JOHN EVERETT [US], et al); | [A]US2017116693 (RAE CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) |