EP3572918 - TOUCH DETECTION CHIP, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING TOUCH SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Guanliang Floor 13, Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Qiu Floor 13, Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Wenhe Floor 13, Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Yufeng Floor 13, Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/48] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18877309.7 | 13.04.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018CN83094 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019196116 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572918 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572918 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/04182 (EP);
G06F3/045 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/04166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSDETEKTIONSCHIP UND BERÜHRUNGSSCHIRMNACHWEISVERFAHREN | [2019/48] | English: | TOUCH DETECTION CHIP, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING TOUCH SCREEN | [2019/48] | French: | PUCE DE DÉTECTION TACTILE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | Translation filed | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20160058273 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [Y] 1,2,7* the whole document *; | [Y]US2017364184 (WEINERTH JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0147]; figures 2A-5 *; | [Y]US2018032176 (KRAH CHRISTOPH H [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071]; figures 3A,3B *; | [Y]US2018059870 (KRAH CHRISTOPH H [US]) [Y] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US8810263 (WILSON COLE [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [A]CN106502451 (CHIPONE TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD ) [A] 1-15; | [A]CN107045401 (FOCALTECH ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]CN107690584 (SHENZHEN GOODIX TECH HOLDINGS) [A] 1-15 | Examination | US2012050214 |