EP3689071 - CORRESPONDING CONFIGURATION FOR SIMULTANEOUS PHYSICAL UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL PUCCH AND PHYSICAL UPLINK SHARED CHANNEL PUSCH TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/24] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jinhua No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 Luleaa / SE | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/24] |
Former [2020/32] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18877450.9 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018CN114569 | Priority number, date | WO2017CN111126 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/111126 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096059 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689071 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689071 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W52/36, H04W52/32, // H04W76/20 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H04W52/365 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0069 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04W76/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTSPRECHENDE KONFIGURATION ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN UPLINK-STEUERKANALS PUCCH UND EINES GEMEINSAMEN PHYSIKALISCHEN UPLINK-KANALS PUSCH | [2020/32] | English: | CORRESPONDING CONFIGURATION FOR SIMULTANEOUS PHYSICAL UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL PUCCH AND PHYSICAL UPLINK SHARED CHANNEL PUSCH TRANSMISSION | [2020/32] | French: | CONFIGURATION CORRESPONDANTE POUR TRANSMISSION SIMULTANÉE D'UN CANAL PHYSIQUE DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE PUCCH ET D'UN CANAL PHYSIQUE PARTAGÉ DE LIAISON MONTANTE PUSCH | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | LU | 08.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016144910 (OFINNO TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,13,16,17 * paragraph [0083] *[I] 4,6,7,11,14,15; | [XI]US2017094612 (DINAN ESMAEL HEJAZI [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,13,16,17 * claim 1 * [I] 4,6,7,11,14,15; | [XI]US2017311317 (DINAN ESMAEL HEJAZI [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10,16,17 * paragraphs [0248] - [0249] * [I] 4,6,7,11,14,15; | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "PUCCH on SCell", vol. RAN WG1, no. Belgrade, Serbia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150419), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-151392, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150419), XP050934267 [X] 1-3,8-10,16,17 * sections 1-3 * [I] 4,6,7,11,14,15 | [XI] - CATT, "Discussion on the simultaneous transmissions of (s)PUCCH and (s)PUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707443, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051272652 [X] 1-3,8-10,16,17 * sections 1-3 * [I] 4,6,7,11,14,15 |