EP3712667 - IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI, Satoshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SAKAE, Kazuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
WARASHINA, Takashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18877856.7 | 06.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018JP41118 | Priority number, date | JP20170219744 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017219744 | [2020/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098085 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712667 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G03B17/02, H04N5/225 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G02B7/025 (EP,US);
G02B7/028 (EP,US);
G02B7/02 (EP);
G03B17/02 (EP,US);
G03B30/00 (US);
H04N23/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/39] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2020 | Translation filed | 08.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011076634 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2014029076 (KATO SEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-15 * paragraph [0090] *; | [XY]WO2014167994 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-9 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]US2015338602 (FURUTAKE YASUKI [JP]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0312]; figures 7a-14a *; | [Y]US2015343885 (ZMEK WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 2-15 * paragraph [0004] *; | [Y]DE102014113733 (JENOPTIK OPTICAL SYS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-15 * paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]DE102015213978 (NIDEC COPAL CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0134] *; | [A]US2016161701 (TAKAMA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,3,5 * | International search | [XA]WO2014167994 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13, 16-17 * , * [A] 14-15; | [A]JP2015004812 (CANON KK) [A] 14-15* . *; | [A]JP2015219437 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | JP2002014269 |