EP3715328 - FLUIDIZED-BED-TYPE REACTOR, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TRICHLOROSILANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROTA, Kenji c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
OGIHARA, Katsuya c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18878647.9 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018JP42558 | Priority number, date | JP20170223143 | 20.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017223143 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098346 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715328 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/107, B01J8/24 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
C01B33/10763 (EP);
C01B33/1071 (KR);
B01J8/24 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/1827 (EP,US);
B01J8/1872 (EP,US);
C01B33/10736 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | WIRBELSCHICHTREAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRICHLORSILAN | [2020/40] | English: | FLUIDIZED-BED-TYPE REACTOR, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TRICHLOROSILANE | [2020/40] | French: | RÉACTEUR DE TYPE À LIT FLUIDISÉ ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION DE TRICHLOROSILANE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2020 | Translation filed | 20.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2210661 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011229398 (TROLL HARALD [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * claim 10 *; | [XY]EP2890635 (HEMLOCK SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 8-10 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 6 | International search | [Y]JPS52129679 (NIPPON MINING CO, et al) [Y] 1-6 * , pp. 1-3, fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009256197 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text & US 2009/0238748 A1, entire text & EP 2105410 A1 & CN 101544373 A & KR 10-2009-0101836 A *; | [Y]JP2010189256 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , abstract, claims, paragraphs [0001], [0004]-[0005], [0012]-[0035], fig. 1, 5 & US 2010/0183496 A1, abstract, claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0035], fig. 1, 5 & US 2012/0164053 A1 & EP 2210661 A2 & CN 101798086 A & KR 10-2010-0085852 A *; | [A]JP2011063480 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-6* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011184242 (JNC CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text (Family: none) * | by applicant | CN201882919U | JP2011184242 | CN203922739U | JP2015089859 |