EP3713280 - NON-CONNECTION STATE MEASUREMENT METHOD, TERMINAL, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Wei Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Xiaodong Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
MA, Jingzhi Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18879294.9 | 11.10.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018CN109834 | Priority number, date | CN201711138908 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711138908 | [2020/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019095906 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713280 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713280 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, // H04W76/15, H04W76/27 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W36/0058 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04W24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN IM NICHTVERBUNDENEN ZUSTAND, ENDGERÄT UND BASISSTATION | [2020/39] | English: | NON-CONNECTION STATE MEASUREMENT METHOD, TERMINAL, AND BASE STATION | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE À L'ÉTAT NON CONNECTÉ, TERMINAL ET STATION DE BASE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | Translation filed | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 14.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23211713.5 / EP4346272 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011103249 (KIM SUN HEE [KR], et al); | [X]WO2012023161 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); |