EP3710174 - METHODS FOR REDUCING MOISTURE CONTENT IN ALKALINE EARTH METAL CARBONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCOA Partners LLC 2180 South 1300 East, Suite 260 Salt Lake City, UT 84106 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALHOUN, Allison Anne 2982 Mill Creek Rd Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | 02 /
BLEVINS, Charles Michael 24086 Trowbridge Ct Daphne, AL 36526 / US | [2021/03] |
Former [2020/46] | 01 /
CALHOUN, Allison Anne 2982 Mill Creek Rd Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | ||
02 /
BLEVINS, Charles Michael 24086 Trowbridge Ct Daphne, AL 36526 / US | |||
Former [2020/39] | 01 /
CALHOUN, Allison Anne 2982 Mill Creek Rd Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | ||
02 /
BLEVINS, Charles Michael PO Box 1794 Daphne, AL 36526 / US | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18879490.3 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61209 | Priority number, date | US201762587932P | 17.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762587932 P | US201862735373P | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735373 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099618 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710174 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/00, B32B5/16, B32B9/04, C01D7/00 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
C09C1/02 (EP);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
B02C17/16 (US);
B02C17/1815 (EP,US);
B02C17/1845 (EP,US);
B02C21/00 (US);
B02C23/12 (US);
C01D7/00 (EP);
C01F11/185 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08K7/00 (EP);
C08K9/04 (US);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09J11/04 (US);
C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (US);
C01P2006/80 (EP);
C01P2006/82 (EP,US);
C08J2323/00 (US);
C08J2327/06 (US);
C08J2375/04 (US);
C08K2003/262 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | B05D7/00, B32B5/16, B32B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DES FEUCHTIGKEITSGEHALTES IN ERDALKALIMETALLCARBONATEN | [2020/39] | English: | METHODS FOR REDUCING MOISTURE CONTENT IN ALKALINE EARTH METAL CARBONATES | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE LA TENEUR EN HUMIDITÉ DANS DES CARBONATES DE MÉTAUX ALCALINO-TERREUX | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 25.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017129782 (BURI MATTHIAS [CH], et al); | [A]US2017275175 (BURI MATTHIAS [CH], et al); | [AP]WO2017220167 (LHOIST RECH ET DEVELOPPEMENT SA [BE]); | [AE]US2018353930 (RENTSCH SAMUEL [CH], et al) | by applicant | US2017129782 | US2017275175 | WO2017220167 | US2018353930 |