EP3710841 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING MULTI-CELL BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nova Semiconductor, Inc. 1740 W. Edmundson Ave. Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHRAFZADEH, Ahmad 1740 W. Edmundson Ave. Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Dainty, Katherine Louise, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18879655.1 | 02.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US58980 | Priority number, date | US201762586884P | 15.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762586884 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099213 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710841 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710841 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/396, H01M10/42, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H03K19/17784, H01M50/51, // G01R19/165, G01R31/3835 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
G01R31/396 (EP,US);
G01R31/3835 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (US);
H02J7/0019 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02M7/1557 (US);
H03K19/17784 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | G01R31/396, H01M10/42, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H03K19/17784, // G01R19/165, G01R31/3835 | ||
Former IPC [2020/39] | G01R19/165, G01R31/36, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR KONTROLLE VON MEHRZELLIGEN BATTERIEN | [2023/02] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING MULTI-CELL BATTERIES | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GESTION DE BATTERIES À CELLULES MULTIPLES | [2020/39] |
Former [2020/39] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWALTUNG VON MEHRZELLENBATTERIEN | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2086060 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * page 1, column l, line 63 - column r, line 115; figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO9310466 (SILENT POWER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph l; figures 1-3 * [A] 8-14[I] 2-7; | [XAI]US6236216 (SHIMOYAMA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 34; figure 2 * * column 5, line 36 - line 50; figure 3 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 30 * [A] 8-14 [I] 2-7; | [A]JP4006877B (DENSO CORP) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0097]; figure 11 *; | [A]US2008278172 (MIYAMOTO MANABU [JP]) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2007257642 (XIAO SEAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-29 * ; entire document *; | [A]US8084997 (MIYAMOTO MANABU [JP]) [A] 1-29 * ; entire document *; | [A]CN103208827 (GUANGZHOU INST ENERGY CONV CAS) [A] 1-29 * ; see machine translation entire document *; | [A]US2014042972 (KIM TAE-JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-29 * ; entire document *; | [A]US8917061 (ZHU DAO-YI [US]) [A] 1-29 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2016093921 (KADIRVEL KARTHIK [US], et al) [A] 1-29* ; entire document *; | [A]US2017250547 (MENZE PETER CARL [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * ; entire document * |