EP3713199 - CAMERA CONTROL METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEI, Naice c/o Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Guohong c/o Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18879665.0 | 13.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018CN115219 | Priority number, date | CN201711122960 | 14.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711122960 | [2020/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096123 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713199 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713199 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04N23/60, H04N23/57 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/026 (EP,CN);
H04M1/72415 (EP,CN);
H04N23/50 (CN,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,CN);
H04M2250/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04M1/02, H04N5/232, H04N5/225, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERASTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/39] | English: | CAMERA CONTROL METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CAMÉRA ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | Translation filed | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 21.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | LU | 13.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005014527 (CHAMBERS MICHAEL J [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP2131257 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2015281525 (THAKUR ANSHUMAN [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0034] *; | [X]CN206433032U (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |