EP3712050 - LEANING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBUYA Yu c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA Kazuo c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18879722.9 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018JP42315 | Priority number, date | JP20170221742 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017221742 | [2020/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098284 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712050 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712050 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/027, F02N11/08, B62K5/05, B62K5/10, B62L3/08, B62K5/08, B60G17/017 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
B62L3/08 (EP);
B60G17/017 (EP);
B62K5/027 (EP);
B62K5/05 (EP);
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62K5/10 (EP);
F02N11/084 (EP);
B60G17/06 (EP);
B60G2202/40 (EP);
B60G2300/12 (EP);
B60G2300/45 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60T2201/06 (EP);
F02N2200/08 (EP);
F02N2200/0801 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | B62K5/10, B62K5/05, B62L3/08, B62K5/027, B62K5/08, F02N11/08, B60G17/017 | ||
Former IPC [2020/52] | B62K5/05, B62K5/10, B62L3/08, F02N11/08, B62K5/027, B62K5/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/39] | B62K5/05, B62K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEIGEFAHRZEUG | [2020/39] | English: | LEANING VEHICLE | [2020/39] | French: | VÉHICULE À INCLINAISON | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | Translation filed | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2199122 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]EP2292496 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2011161856 (EQUOS RES CO LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2011057018 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2012025370 (EQUOS RES CO LTD); | [A]WO2013051195 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2014199041 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]WO2015146680 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2017086350 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP2127920 | EP3124365 | by applicant | JP2005313876 | JP2017221742 |