EP3709799 - INSECT RELEASE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verily Life Sciences LLC 2999 Olympus Blvd 10th Floor / Ste 1000 Dallas, TX 75019 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASSARO, Peter c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Ave. South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
SOBECKI, Robert c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Ave. South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
BEHLING, Charles c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Ave. South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
WASSON, Brian c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Ave. South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18879850.8 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61009 | Priority number, date | US201762587125P | 16.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762587125 P | US201816189286 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US201816189286 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099487 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709799 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/033, A01K1/02, A01K97/04, B64C39/02, B64D1/12, B64D1/16 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
A01K67/033 (EP,US);
B64D1/08 (US);
F41A19/55 (US);
F42B12/46 (EP,US);
F42B12/56 (EP,US);
F42B12/76 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | INSEKTENFREISETZENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/39] | English: | INSECT RELEASE DEVICES | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE LIBÉRATION D'INSECTES | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 02.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 10.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2160436 (JONES JOHN H) | International search | [A]US4106438 (NELSON ROGER K); | [Y]US4825577 (BRANNON ROLAND [US]); | [A]US6561125 (LOHSOMBOON VESSPONG [US]); | [XY]US2006266292 (DUCKWORTH WILLIAM J [CA]); | [A]US2014020630 (COURTRIGHT GLEN NEIL [US]); | [Y]US2015320024 (LOOS GAIL D [US]) | by applicant | US2160436 |