EP3718326 - SYSTEM AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianhua No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
XU, Yang No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 18880212.8 | 27.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018CN117771 | Priority number, date | US201762590990P | 27.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590990 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101217 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718326 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14, H04W68/02, H04W36/22, // H04W76/27, H04W88/06 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
H04W36/14 (EP,KR);
H04W36/0022 (US);
H04W36/02 (KR);
H04W36/22 (EP);
H04W36/30 (US);
H04W36/304 (EP,KR);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W68/02 (EP,KR);
H04W76/19 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | H04W8/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2020/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.04.2022 | 07.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/37] | 12.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010050758 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,9,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0051] - [0 58] - [0060] - [0 73] , [0 80] - [0082]; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 5,8,11 [I] 2-4,6,7,10-13; | [YA]WO2010121191 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 5,8,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039]; figures 2B,4B * [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12-15; | [XYI]EP3043595 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0070]; figures 5,7; claims 1,3 * [Y] 5,8,11 [I] 2-4,6,7,10-13; | [YA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Single Radio Voice Call Continuity (SRVCC) enhancements; Stage 2 (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.856, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100720), no. V1.1.0, pages 1 - 63, XP050442011 [Y] 5,8,11 * page 39,section 6.10.3 * [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12-15 |