EP3714923 - INJECTION HEAD AND CHEMICAL INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nemoto Kyorindo Co., Ltd. 27-20, Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMOTO, Shigeru c/o Nemoto Kyorindo Co. Ltd. 27-20 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 02 /
FUKIKOSHI, Yumiko c/o Nemoto Kyorindo Co. Ltd. 27-20 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 03 /
KANETAKA, Toshio c/o Nemoto Kyorindo Co. Ltd. 27-20 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 04 /
SAITOH, Yasufumi c/o Nemoto Kyorindo Co. Ltd. 27-20 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18880532.9 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018JP43248 | Priority number, date | JP20170226350 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017226350 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103110 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714923 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/14, A61M5/36, A61M5/168, A61M5/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/14566 (EP);
A61M5/007 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/31511 (CN,US);
A61M5/1408 (EP);
A61M5/20 (CN);
A61M5/31 (CN);
A61M5/31596 (CN,US);
A61M5/36 (EP,CN);
A61M2005/3125 (CN,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,CN);
A61M2205/18 (EP,CN);
A61M2205/505 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | A61M5/145, A61M5/14, A61M5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSKOPF UND CHEMISCHE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/40] | English: | INJECTION HEAD AND CHEMICAL INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2020/40] | French: | TÊTE D'INJECTION ET DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE PRODUIT CHIMIQUE LA COMPRENANT | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | Translation filed | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1572266 (MEDRAD INC [US]); | [A]JP2007229287 (NEMOTO KYORINDO KK); | [A]WO2011125987 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016167330 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2016208611 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP]); | [IA]WO2017040152 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) | International search | [A]JP2006510450 ; | [A]JP2007229287 (NEMOTO KYORINDO KK); | [Y]WO2011125987 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016167330 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2016208611 (NEMOTO KYORINDO CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]WO2017040152 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) | by applicant | JPS584543B | JP5492873B | JP5586310B |