EP3706464 - SCHEDULING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Fengwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
QIU, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18880602.0 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018CN117006 | Priority number, date | CN201711185048 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711185048 | [2020/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101143 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706464 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3706464 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, // H04W28/26, H04W84/04 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/535 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04W28/26 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W80/08 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | H04W28/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/37] | English: | SCHEDULING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLANIFICATION | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2020 | Translation filed | 03.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 03.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2018 | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | CY | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | DK | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | ES | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | IT | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | MK | 27.07.2022 | MT | 27.07.2022 | NL | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SI | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | GB | 22.11.2022 | IE | 22.11.2022 | LU | 22.11.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 22.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
IT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
IT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 22.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
IT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 22.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
GB | 22.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
LU | 22.11.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 27.07.2022 | |
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 27.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008043647 (YOSHIDA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2010064828 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]EP2217012 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014124164 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |