EP3608993 - BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING CONNECTING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/07] | CONNECTING BOARD AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2024/45] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - German title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - English title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - French title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Youngsun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
JEON, Hyun Wook LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18881256.4 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018KR14013 | Priority number, date | KR20170159729 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170159729 | [2020/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103400 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608993 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/211, H01M50/262, H01M50/298, H01M50/505, H01M50/531, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6561, H01M10/48 | [2024/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/482 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/262 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,KR);
H01M10/6561 (EP,KR);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/298 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/531 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6561, H01M2/26, H01M10/48 | ||
Former IPC [2020/07] | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6561, H01M2/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL MIT ANSCHLUSSPLATTE | [2024/45] | English: | BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING CONNECTING BOARD | [2024/45] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE COMPRENANT CARTE DE CONNEXION | [2024/45] |
Former [2020/07] | ANSCHLUSSPLATTE UND BATTERIEMODUL DAMIT | ||
Former [2020/07] | CONNECTING BOARD AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME | ||
Former [2020/07] | CARTE DE CONNEXION ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LA COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | Translation filed | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2698847 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XA]US2016248070 (AHN KWANG WOOK [KR]); | [XAI]KR20170057740 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170094981 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR101320393B [A] 1-16; | [A]KR20170050511 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16; | [XA]KR20170057740 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 [A] 6-16; | [A]KR20170094981 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16; | [A]KR20170095052 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 |