EP3717360 - APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A CABLE LACING TAPE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION 526 Thorpe Road Orlando, Florida 32824 / US | [2022/02] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states Ideal Industries, Inc. Becker Place Sycamore, IL 60178 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILDES, Trevor D. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 02 /
TYRRELL, James W. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 03 /
EATON, Edward T. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 04 /
ZANTOUT, Alan E. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 05 /
WEIBY, Michael R. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 06 /
HOFFMAN, Randy E. Becker Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18881320.8 | 27.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018US62640 | Priority number, date | US201762590845P | 27.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590845 P | US201862703993P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862703993 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019104333 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717360 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/02, B65B13/22, B65B13/24 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B65B13/22 (EP,US);
B65B13/027 (US);
B65B13/185 (US);
B65B13/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | B65B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN EINER KABELBINDER-BANDVORRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A CABLE LACING TAPE DEVICE | [2020/41] | French: | APPAREIL POUR TENDRE UN DISPOSITIF DE BANDE D'ENTRELACEMENT DE CÂBLES | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3493015 (GOLAND DAVID VERE) [A] 1-15 * figures 3, 8-11 * * column 3, lines 36-48 * * column 4, lines 12-61 * * column 10, lines 33-43 *; | [A]EP0521199 (SAKAMOTO KAZUMO [JP]) [A] 1-9,14,15 * figures 4, 12, 13 * * column 9, lines 1-21 *; | [A]DE29819541U (KLAUS MASCHINENBAU INH BERND K [DE]) [A] 1-9,14,15 * figure 2 * * page 2, lines 23-48 *; | [A]US2005115629 (BERNARD WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 10-13 * figures 2, 8 ** paragraphs [0020] , [0 30] *; | [A]US2009071350 (FAY ADOLF [DE]) [A] 10-13 * figures 10-22 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] - [0 55] , [0 56] *; | [A]US2016236804 (WEIBY MICHAEL RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-9,14,15 * figures 1, 4, 20 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 31] , [0 34] , [0 39] * | International search | [YA]US4064918 (POBUTA WALTER, et al) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document * [A] 7-9; | [YA]EP0521199 (SAKAMOTO KAZUMO [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * entire document * [A] 7-9; | [Y]US2005178461 (MAGNO JOEY D JR [US], et al) [Y] 1-9* entire document *; | [Y]US2007089801 (HILLEGONDS LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * entire document *; | [YA]US2016236804 (WEIBY MICHAEL RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * entire document * [A] 7-9 |