EP3714172 - EASILY REMOVEABLE PUSH-ON SPRING NUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penn Engineering & Manufacturing Corp. 5190 Old Easton Road Danboro, PA 18916 / US | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNK, Jonathan 1341 Brandywine Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19123 / US | 02 /
MALONEY, Michael 5480 Silo Hill Road Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18902 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18881682.1 | 13.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018US60744 | Priority number, date | US201762589874P | 22.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762589874 P | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103879 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714172 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714172 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/06, F16B21/07, F16B21/10, F16B21/20, F16B39/10, F16B2/24, // F16B37/02 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
F16B21/075 (EP);
F16B21/076 (US);
F16B2/245 (EP);
F16B21/06 (US);
F16B21/07 (US);
F16B21/10 (US);
F16B21/20 (EP,US);
F16B39/10 (US);
F16B37/02 (EP);
F16B5/0642 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | F16B21/06, F16B21/07, F16B21/10, F16B21/20, F16B39/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHT ABNEHMBARE AUFSTECKFEDERMUTTER | [2020/40] | English: | EASILY REMOVEABLE PUSH-ON SPRING NUT | [2020/40] | French: | ÉCROU À RESSORT À POUSSER AMOVIBLE FACILEMENT | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | ES | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | ES | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2055166 (BERRY PAUL F) [A] 1-15* figure 9 *; | [A]US2568584 (HARTMAN RICHARD A) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,6 * * column 6, lines 41-57 *; | [A]US2017097026 (KORBER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034]; figure 12 * | International search | [A]US2055166 (BERRY PAUL F) [A] 1-15 * ; Figures 1-6, column 1 lines 45-50, column 2 lines 1-25 *; | [A]US2568584 (HARTMAN RICHARD A) [A] 1-15 * ; Figures 1-6, column 4 lines 15-35 *; | [A]US5833422 (HAGA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; Figure 1, column 2 lines 30-40 *; | [A]WO0116499 (SHOP VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* ; Figures 2-5, page 3 lines 10-20, page 4 lines 1-5 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Flat Type Washers, Flat Type Speed Nuts", Bolt Products Inc., (20170501), URL: http://www.boltproducts.com:80/tinnerman/locking-flat.html, (20181221), XP055615538 [A] 1-15 * ; Page 1 * | Examination | JPS60161712U |