EP3715420 - ETHYLENE-VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER COMPOSITION, MELT-FORMING MATERIAL, MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, AND MULTILAYER PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/40] | ETHYLENE VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER COMPOSITION, MATERIAL FOR MELT MOLDING, MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, AND MULTILAYER PIPE | ||
[2023/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USUI Shintaro c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | 02 /
IKESHITA Minako c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18881907.2 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018JP43119 | Priority number, date | JP20170224273 | 22.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017224273 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103081 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715420 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715420 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/12, C08K5/00, C08K5/101, C08K5/13, B32B1/02, B32B1/08, B32B7/12, B32B25/08, B32B25/14, B32B27/08, B32B27/20, B32B27/22, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, // B29K23/00, B29K105/00, F16L9/12, F16L11/04 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
B29B9/12 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/22 (EP);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B27/325 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C08K5/005 (EP);
C08K5/101 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (US);
F16L9/14 (US);
B29K2023/086 (EP);
B29K2105/0044 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2272/00 (EP);
B32B2307/308 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/73 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2307/736 (EP);
B32B2410/00 (EP);
B32B2439/02 (EP);
B32B2439/46 (EP);
B32B2439/60 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2439/80 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L23/0861 (EP);
C08K5/005, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08K5/101, C08L23/0861 (EP);
C08K5/101, C08L29/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/02] | B29B9/12, C08L29/04, C08L23/08, C08K5/101, C08K5/13, C08K5/00, F16L9/14, F16L11/04, // B29K23/00, B29K105/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/40] | C08L29/04, B32B27/08, B32B27/18, B32B27/28, C08K5/101, C08K5/13, C08L23/08, F16L9/14, F16L11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETHYLENVINYLALKOHOL-COPOLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, MATERIAL ZUR SCHMELZFORMUNG, MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR UND MEHRSCHICHTIGES ROHR | [2020/40] | English: | ETHYLENE-VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER COMPOSITION, MELT-FORMING MATERIAL, MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, AND MULTILAYER PIPE | [2023/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMÈRE D'ÉTHYLÈNE-ALCOOL VINYLIQUE, MATÉRIAU POUR MOULAGE PAR FUSION, STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE ET TUYAU MULTICOUCHE | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/40] | ETHYLENE VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER COMPOSITION, MATERIAL FOR MELT MOLDING, MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, AND MULTILAYER PIPE | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2020 | Translation filed | 13.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | LU | 22.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2554592 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [A]EP2554590 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [A]EP3053960 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | International search | [X]WO2011125736 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2017082063 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]); | [PA]WO2017204272 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS63286459 | WO2011125736 | JP2014172928 |