EP3719045 - RUBBER-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMER, RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING RUBBER-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMER, AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGI Misaki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA Shinji c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
IIMORI Masashi c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 04 /
UEDA Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 05 /
ARAI Hiroya c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18882055.9 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP43162 | Priority number, date | JP20170226679 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017226679 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103092 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719045 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L21/00, C08F265/06, C08L51/00, C08L67/00, C08L69/00, C08L101/00, C08L9/06, C08L67/02 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08F279/02 (KR,US);
C08F2/26 (EP);
C08L101/00 (EP);
C08L51/003 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F265/06, C08F220/14, C08F220/40 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L25/12, C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L51/04, C08L67/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/41] | C08F265/06, C08L51/00, C08L67/00, C08L69/00, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKHALTIGES PFROPFPOLYMER, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DEM KAUTSCHUKHALTIGEN PFROPFPOLYMER UND FORMARTIKEL DARAUS | [2020/41] | English: | RUBBER-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMER, RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING RUBBER-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMER, AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF SAME | [2020/41] | French: | POLYMÈRE GREFFÉ CONTENANT DU CAOUTCHOUC, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE CONTENANT LE POLYMÈRE GREFFÉ CONTENANT DU CAOUTCHOUC, ET ARTICLE MOULÉ AVEC LADITE RÉSINE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | Translation filed | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 17.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003092819 (MIYATAKE NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * Preparation example 3; paragraph [0060]; examples 1,2; table 3 *; | [A]US2008085975 (SAEGUSA KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0066]; examples 1-26; tables 2,4 *; | [A]US2016053040 (FUJIKAWA YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0240] - [0243]; examples 1-4,11-14; tables 6,7,9,10 *; | [A]EP2998361 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0090] - [0096] *; | [A]EP3034532 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0071]; examples 1-3; tables 2,3,5 *; | [A]WO2016136726 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * examples 1-6; tables 2,3,5 *; | [A]US2016333130 (WAKITA AYAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 1,3,5,6,7,9,11 *; | [P]EP3263645 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS4828094 (THE NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6, 12-17 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS63280712 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [A] 1-6, 12-17 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003020377 (UBE CYCON LTD) [A] 1-6, 12-17 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2007231149 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [Y] 12-17 * , claims, examples (Family: none) * [A] 1-6; | [XY]JP2009203435 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-6 * , claims, paragraph [0077], examples (Family: none) * [Y] 12-17; | [XY]JP2014145029 (UMG ABS LTD) [X] 1-6, 12, 14, 16, 17 * , claims, paragraphs [0029], [0073], examples & US 2015/0322261 A1, claims, paragraphs [0075], [0176], examples & TW 201439199 A & CN 104955898 A & KR 10-2015-0102041 A * [Y] 13, 15; | [A]WO2017170399 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6, 12-17* , entire text (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2002173501 | WO2013157569 | JP2017226679 |