EP3713394 - COMPUTING RISK FROM A CROP DAMAGING FACTOR FOR A CROP ON AN AGRONOMIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Climate LLC 4 City Place, Suite 100 St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2023/04] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Climate LLC 201 Third Street Suite 1050 San Francisco CA 94103 / US | ||
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states The Climate Corporation 201 Third Street, Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAIL, Holly Janine 201 3rd Street 1100 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
CARROLL, Patricia Ann 201 3rd Street 1100 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 03 /
GRABOW, Bethany Susan Porter 201 Third Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 04 /
PATAKY, Jerald Keith 201 Third Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 05 /
MALAGON, Ana 201 Third Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 18882105.2 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018US59858 | Priority number, date | US201715820317 | 21.11.2017 Original published format: US201715820317 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103850 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713394 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/02, A01G25/16, G01W1/06, A01M7/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G06Q50/02 (EP,US);
A01M7/0089 (EP);
G06Q10/0635 (EP,US);
G01W1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | A01G25/16, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | BERECHNUNG DES RISIKOS EINES KULTURPFLANZENSCHÄDIGENDEN FAKTORS FÜR EINE KULTURPFLANZE AUF EINEM AGRONOMISCHEN FELD | [2020/40] | English: | COMPUTING RISK FROM A CROP DAMAGING FACTOR FOR A CROP ON AN AGRONOMIC FIELD | [2020/40] | French: | CALCUL DE RISQUE LIÉ À UN FACTEUR D'ENDOMMAGEMENT DE CULTURE POUR UNE CULTURE DANS UN CHAMP AGRONOMIQUE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9563852 (WILES LORI J [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * column 1 - column 3 ** abstract *; | [I] - PAUL P. A. ET AL, "Influence of Temperature and Relative Humidity on Sporulation of Cercospora zeae-maydis and Expansion of Gray Leaf Spot Lesions on Maize Leaves", PLANT DISEASE, US, vol. 89, no. 6, doi:10.1094/PD-89-0624, ISSN 0191-2917, (20050601), pages 624 - 630, URL: https://apsjournals.apsnet.org/doi/pdf/10.1094/PD-89-0624, (20210618), XP055815296 [I] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/PD-89-0624 | International search | [A]US2012123817 (HOHENBERGER JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2016078570 (ETHINGTON JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2016223506 (SHRIVER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2017295732 (SKINNER PAUL W [US]) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2017311559 (EBERT DAVID SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document * |