EP3713469 - PATIENT INTERFACE FOR LIGHT ADJUSTABLE INTRAOCULAR LENS IRRADIATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RxSight, Inc. 100 Columbia Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDIS, John 21 Whistling Isle Irvine CA 92614 / US | 02 /
GOLDSHLEGER, Ilya 8 Chimney Ln. Ladera Ranch CA 92694 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18882132.6 | 24.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018US62407 | Priority number, date | US201715822099 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: US201715822099 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019104256 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713469 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, A61B3/13, A61B3/18, A61F9/007, A61F9/009, A61F2/16, A61N5/06, A61N5/067, B29D11/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61N5/067 (EP,US);
A61F2/16 (US);
A61F2/1624 (EP,US);
A61F2/1659 (EP);
A61F9/00 (US);
A61F2/1635 (US);
A61F2002/1699 (US);
A61F2009/0052 (US);
A61F2210/0085 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0004 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0633 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0648 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0654 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0661 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | A61B3/10, A61B3/13, A61B3/18, A61F9/007, A61F9/009 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN LICHTADAPTIERBARES INTRAOKULARLINSENBESTRAHLUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/40] | English: | PATIENT INTERFACE FOR LIGHT ADJUSTABLE INTRAOCULAR LENS IRRADIATION SYSTEM | [2020/40] | French: | INTERFACE PATIENT POUR SYSTÈME D'IRRADIATION DE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE RÉGLABLE PAR LA LUMIÈRE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 21.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2270837 (MERIDIAN AG [CH]) [Y] 9,10* claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US2008287927 (RATHJEN CHRISTIAN [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]US2012078241 (GOODING PHILIP [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0032] , [0036] *; | [XY]EP2633841 (ZIEMER OPHTHALMIC SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0025] , [0027] * [Y] 3,5,7-10; | [Y]WO2015119892 (OPTIMEDICA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US2016235588 (HART JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,11 * paragraphs [0047] , [0050] , [0133] * | International search | [Y]US3706304 (SISLER HAMPSON A) [Y] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US6905641 (PLATT BEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014216468 (GOLDSHLEGER ILYA [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017325675 (LIU QINGDI [US], et al) [Y] 9,10* entire document * | by applicant | US2002100990 | US6450642 | EP2633841 |