EP3701199 - AIR CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Euy Sung 27 Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16700 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Nak Hyun 14 Dongbaekjungang-ro 108beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17012 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ju Young 16 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16711 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jee Ho 57 Gwongwang-ro 340beon-gil Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16497 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Moon Sun 27 Seocheonseo-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17107 / KR | 06 /
SHIN, Sang Ho 19 Taejang-ro 71beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16688 / KR | 07 /
OH, Seung Won 55 Naejeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13611 / KR | 08 /
OH, Jeong Kyo 82 Gwanggyojungang-ro 25beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16500 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Jun Hwa 1526 Bongyeong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16701 / KR | 10 /
LEE, Tae Yong 81 Cheongmyeongbuk-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16709 / KR | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18882180.5 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018KR04283 | Priority number, date | KR20170159175 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170159175 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103249 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701199 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3701199 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/20, F24F3/16, F24F11/89 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B01D46/0056 (EP,KR);
F24F13/20 (KR);
B01D46/0013 (KR,US);
B01D46/56 (US);
B01D46/58 (EP,KR,US);
F16B21/165 (EP,KR);
F16D1/10 (KR,US);
F24F11/89 (KR);
F24F8/10 (KR);
H01R13/2421 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/6276 (EP,KR,US);
H01R39/64 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGER | [2020/36] | English: | AIR CLEANER | [2020/36] | French: | ÉPURATEUR D'AIR | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 17.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN104307259 (SUZHOU BOHAN ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * figure 1 * [I] 2,5-14; | [A]CN105091125 (QINGDAO HAIER AIR CONDITIONER) [A] 1-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]CN106032914 (QINGDAO HAIER AIR CONDITIONER) [A] 1-14* figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2017248339 (MUN YEONGCHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]KR200378995Y (WINIAMANDO INC.) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0028]; and figures 1-2. *; | [XA]KR20060026319 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4, 9 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0055]; claim 1; and figures 1, 4. * [A] 5-8, 10-14; | [A]US2007131114 (LANKER NOAM [IL], et al) [A] 1-14* See paragraphs [0037]-[0040]; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]JP2012149879 (AKOS R & D LTD) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0064]-[0069]; and figure 1. *; | [A]WO2017146352 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0069]-[0070]; and figure 1. * | by applicant | CN104307259 |