EP3718975 - FILTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAHI Yuka c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 02 /
MINAMINO Atsushi c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 03 /
KURIHARA Hiroyuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA Katsushige c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2020/41] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18882583.0 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP43992 | Priority number, date | JP20170230775 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017230775 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107498 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718975 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718975 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, B01D61/02, B01D61/14, B01D61/58, B01D65/02, B01D65/00, B01D61/10, B01D61/12, B01D61/20, B01D61/22, C13B20/16, C13B35/08 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
B01D65/00 (EP);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
B01D61/02 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP);
B01D61/12 (EP);
B01D61/14 (EP,US);
B01D61/20 (EP);
B01D61/22 (EP);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/008 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/442 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C13B20/165 (EP);
C13K1/04 (EP,US);
C13K1/08 (EP);
B01D2311/25 (EP);
B01D2311/2523 (US);
B01D2313/18 (US);
B01D2313/50 (EP);
B01D2313/501 (US);
B01D2315/10 (EP);
B01D2317/022 (US);
B01D2317/025 (EP,US);
B01D2321/04 (EP);
B01D2321/12 (US);
C02F2103/22 (EP);
C02F2209/40 (EP);
C02F2209/42 (EP);
C02F2301/08 (EP);
C02F2303/16 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | C02F1/44, B01D61/02, B01D61/14, B01D61/58, B01D65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | FILTER DEVICE | [2020/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | Translation filed | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013312738 (KISHIMOTO JUNPEI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2014108382 (MIURA KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2014184411 (MIURA KOGYO KK) | International search | [Y]JPS5338899 (HITACHI LTD); | [YA]JPS5432179 (EBARA INFILCO); | [Y]JPS58198299 (SHINNENRYOYU KAIHATSU GIJUTSU); | [Y]JPS6025510 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH08965 (NORITAKE CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005102519 (KURITA WATER IND LTD); | [Y]JP2013063076 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2015136654 (DAICEN MEMBRANE SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]JP2015199020 (KOBELCO ECO SOLUTIONS CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2016032810 (MIURA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPS6467173 | WO2010067785 | JP2014184411 |