EP3719950 - ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LS Electric Co., Ltd. LS Tower, 127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14119 / KR | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WON, Sung-Ha 40 LS-ro 116beon-gil Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18884397.3 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018KR13995 | Priority number, date | KR20170159941 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170159941 | KR20170159942 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170159942 | [2020/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107807 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719950 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J9/06, H02J7/00, // H02J1/10 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H02J7/0063 (EP,US);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
H02J1/102 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | H02J3/32, H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2020/41] | English: | ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | Translation filed | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6487096 (GILBRETH MARK [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 9 *; | [X]US2011210614 (MIN BYEONG-SEON [KR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0063] *; | [I]US2015001932 (INOUE SADAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * abstract ** paragraphs [0030] - [0041] *; | [A]WO2015102398 (HYOSUNG CORP [KR]) [A] 9 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] *; | [X]US2017093187 (PARK SANGSOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0032] - [0047] * | International search | [A]JP2010093868 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [Y]KR20160129153 (UNIV KOREA POLYTECHNIC IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [Y] 3-10, 13-20; | [XY]KR20170048992 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1, 2 [Y] 3-20; | [Y]KR20170079184 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 11-20; | [A]JP2017205007 (LSIS CO LTD)[A] 1-20 |