EP3717941 - PEROVSKITE MANGANESE OXIDES WITH STRONG MAGNETOCALORIC EFFECT AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virginia Commonwealth University Bio-Tec One, 3rd Floor Suite 3000 800 East Leigh Street Box 980568 Richmond, Virginia 23298 / US | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTER, Everett E. 9053 Aldingham Place Mechanicsville Virginia 32116 / US | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Moré, Solveig Helga, et al Kroher Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18884591.1 | 01.12.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018US63523 | Priority number, date | US201762593443P | 01.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762593443 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019109059 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717941 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/01 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H01F1/017 (EP);
H01F1/012 (US);
F25B21/00 (US);
F25B2321/002 (US);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | G02B1/10, H01F1/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | PEROWSKITMANGANOXIDE MIT STARKER MAGNETOKALORISCHER WIRKUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/41] | English: | PEROVSKITE MANGANESE OXIDES WITH STRONG MAGNETOCALORIC EFFECT AND USES THEREOF | [2020/41] | French: | OXYDES DE MANGANÈSE DE TYPE PÉROVSKITE À FORT EFFET MAGNÉTOCALORIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2012033002 (SEELER FABIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0075] , [0139] *[A] 1-12; | [XYI] - TSUI ET AL, "Enhanced near room temperature magnetocaloric effect in La 0.6 Ca 0.4 MnO 3 for magnetic refrigeration application", RSC ADV., (20171002), vol. 7, no. 74, doi:10.1039/C7RA06619H, pages 46589 - 46593, XP055616135 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15 [I] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7RA06619H | [XAYI] - ZHONG ET AL, "Dependence of the magnetocaloric effect on oxygen stoichiometry in polycrystalline La"2"/"3Ba"1"/"3MnO"3"-"@d", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (20030401), vol. 261, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0304-8853(02)01479-8, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 238 - 243, XP004456798 [X] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(02)01479-8 | [XAYI] - LÓPEZ ET AL, "Specific heat and magnetic properties of Nd0.5Sr0.5MnO3 and R0.5Ca0.5MnO3 (R=Nd, Sm, Dy, and Ho)", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (20031001), vol. 94, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.1606517, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 4395 - 4399, XP012060273 [X] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1606517 | [XAYI] - ZHONG ET AL, "Synthesis, structure and magnetic entropy change of polycrystalline La"1"-"xK"xMnO"3"+"@d", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (19990401), vol. 195, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0304-8853(98)01080-4, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 112 - 118, XP004166694 [X] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(98)01080-4 | International search | [Y]EP0669296 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3, 18/3 * ; entire document, especially abstract *; | [A]CN101224907 (UNIV JIAOTONG SOUTHWEST [CN]) [A] 1-19 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2012033002 (SEELER FABIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19* ; entire document *; | [XY] - TSUI et al., "Enhanced near room temperature magnetocaloric effect in La0.6Ca0.4MnO3 for magnetic refrigeration application", RSC Advances, (20171002), vol. 74, pages 46589 - 93, XP055616135 [X] 1-2, 4-17, 18/(1-2, 4-17), 19 * ; entire document, especially abstract, pg 46589 col 2 para 2, pg 46590 col 1 para 2, pg 46590 col 2 para 1, pg 46592 Table 1 * [Y] 3, 18/3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7RA06619H |