EP3719868 - POROUS FILM, SEPARATOR FOR SECONDARY CELL, AND SECONDARY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAI Nobuyasu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
IKOMA Kei c/o Nasu Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | 03 /
TSUKUDA Akimitsu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/41] | 01 /
KAI Nobuyasu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
IKOMA Kei c/o Nasu Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUKUDA Akimitsu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18884610.9 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP42830 | Priority number, date | JP20170227528 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017227528 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107219 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719868 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M50/449, H01M50/457, H01M50/409, B32B5/24 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H01M50/457 (EP,US);
H01M50/414 (EP,KR);
B32B5/24 (US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/42 (EP,US);
H01M50/423 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/426 (EP,US);
H01M50/443 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/446 (KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/451 (EP,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (KR);
H01M50/491 (KR);
B32B2457/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | H01M2/16, B32B5/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | PORÖSE FOLIE, SEPARATOR FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2020/41] | English: | POROUS FILM, SEPARATOR FOR SECONDARY CELL, AND SECONDARY CELL | [2020/41] | French: | FILM POREUX, SÉPARATEUR POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | Translation filed | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 27.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2013020769 (TEIJIN LTD); | [X]WO2017047576 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2010214966 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JP2013191550 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2014149936 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [A]WO2017047576 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) | by applicant | JP2013020769 | JP5183435B | JP5286817B | JP2017227528 | other | EP1826842 | EP2530114 | JP2013020769 |