EP3720384 - UROLOGICAL IMPLANT HAVING EXTRACTION HANDLE AND/OR ARCHED MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butterfly Medical Ltd. Beit Tavor 2nd Entrance 3rd Floor 20692 Yokneam / IL | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHAR, Yehuda Keren Hayesod 9 54051 Givaat Shmuel / IL | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18885250.3 | 03.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018IL51321 | Priority number, date | US201762595147P | 06.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762595147 P | US201862644627P | 19.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862644627 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019111247 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720384 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, A61F2/86 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,IL);
A61F2/9517 (IL,US);
A61F2/962 (IL,US);
A61F2002/047 (EP,IL);
A61F2002/048 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | UROLOGISCHES IMPLANTAT MIT EXTRAKTIONSGRIFF UND/ODER GEWÖLBTEN ELEMENTEN | [2020/42] | English: | UROLOGICAL IMPLANT HAVING EXTRACTION HANDLE AND/OR ARCHED MEMBERS | [2020/42] | French: | IMPLANT UROLOGIQUE AYANT DES ÉLÉMENTS ARQUÉS ET/OU UNE POIGNÉE D'EXTRACTION | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5269802 (GARBER BRUCE B [US]); | [XAI]WO2015111063 (BUTTERFLY MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [A]US2015257908 (CHAO TIFFANY E [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2017017499 (BUTTERFLY MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [A]US2017135830 (HARKIN CONOR [IE], et al) | International search | [Y]US2006276887 (BRADY PETER [IE], et al); | [X]US2008065209 (PFLUEGER D RUSSELL [US]); | [A]US2012136199 (HOU MARI [US], et al); | [A]WO2015111063 (BUTTERFLY MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [A]US2016317180 (KILEMNIK IDO [IL]); | [Y]WO2017017499 (BUTTERFLY MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [X]US2017135830 (HARKIN CONOR [IE], et al) | by applicant | WO2015011063 | WO2017017499 |