EP3722454 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING GOLD SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GOLD FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6422 / JP | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO Tetsuya c/o Tomioka Plant TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K. K. 820-1 Oshidashi, Ichinomiya Tomioka-shi Gunma 370-2452 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO Yohei c/o Tomioka Plant TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K. K. 820-1 Oshidashi, Ichinomiya Tomioka-shi Gunma 370-2452 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKURA Chiharu c/o Tomioka Plant TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K. K. 820-1 Oshidashi, Ichinomiya Tomioka-shi Gunma 370-2452 / JP | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18885294.1 | 05.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018JP44717 | Priority number, date | JP20170234730 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017234730 | [2020/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019111945 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722454 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, C22F1/14, C22C5/02, C23C14/14 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C22C5/02 (EP);
C23C14/3414 (EP,KR,US);
C22F1/14 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3423 (KR);
H01J37/3426 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | C23C14/34, C22F1/14, C22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GOLDSPUTTERTARGETS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GOLDFILMS | [2020/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING GOLD SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GOLD FILM | [2020/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION D'OR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FILM D'OR | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | Translation filed | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 28.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]TW201028490 (SOLAR APPLIED MAT TECH CORP [TW]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]US2016343553 (MARUKO TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * example 1 *; | [E]EP3467141 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * examples 1-29 *; | [T] - Standards National Bureau, "Gold", Standard X-ray Diffraction Patterns - Volume 1, (19531231), vol. 079175, page 33, XP055776897 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002146521 (NIKKO MATERIALS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , *; | [XA]WO2015111563 (FURUYA METAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9, 11-15 * , 6 , 0 3 1 - 0 0 3 7 & US 2016/0343553 A1, 1 - 1 * [A] 10; | [PX]WO2017209281 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP]) [PX] 1-15* , 1 1 4 & TW 201742942 A * | by applicant | JP2009512779 | JP2013204052 | WO2015111563 |