EP3721211 - SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A TEST SAMPLE AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard M/C 6-32 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHERER, Axel PO Box 5 Barnard Vermont 05031 / US | 02 /
NATEGHI, Amirhossein 1001 E. Villa St. Apt. 8 Pasadena California 91106 / US | 03 /
JEON, Taeyoon 146 S. Michigan Ave. 204 Pasadena California 91106 / US | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18885676.9 | 06.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US64340 | Priority number, date | US201762595362P | 06.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762595362 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019113379 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721211 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N21/31, G01N21/64, G01N35/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01N1/42 (US);
G01N1/44 (US);
G01N21/171 (US);
G01N21/255 (US);
G01N21/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | G01N21/35, G01N21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANALYSE EINER TESTPROBE UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A TEST SAMPLE AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON D'ESSAI ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6488892 (BURTON WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,12 * abstract ** column 15, line 47 - column 17, line 66 *; | [XAI]WO2004048929 (HYPER 3 INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12,14 * abstract * * page 5, line 28 * * page 11, lines 2-7 * * page 12, lines 12-29 * * page 18, lines 22-29 * * page 26, lines 1-4,18-21 * * page 28, lines 25-30 * * page 34, line 5 - page 35, line 2 * [A] 3 [I] 4,8,10,11,13,15; | [XI]WO2016168386 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 19, line 18 - page 23, line 5 * * page 55, lines 8-16 * [I] 4,6,10,11,13; | [XAI]US9557269 (CHERUBINI CLAUDIO [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,12 * abstract * * column 8, lines 46-63 * * column 10, line 61 - column 12, line 3 * [A] 3 [I] 6-8,10,11,13-15 | International search | [Y]US4886358 (PELLENBARG ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 20* entire document *; | [XY]US6488892 (BURTON WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 12, 18, 22 * entire document * [Y] 5, 7-11, 13-17, 19-21, 23-26; | [Y]US2005239211 (UCHIHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 19, 21 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012199742 (WAGNER MATTHIAS [US], et al) [Y] 7-10, 13-16, 23-25 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012287418 (SCHERER JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document *; | [Y]US8323466 (KIM SUNNIE PARK [US], et al) [Y] 11, 17, 26 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013107254 (YU WEI WEN [US], et al) [Y] 3 * entire document * | by applicant | US6488892 | WO2004048292 | WO2016168386 | US9557269 |