EP3725828 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1 Kyobashi 3-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OISHI, Shigeki c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
KAJI, Yoshio c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18887321.0 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018JP46141 | Priority number, date | JP20170239877 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017239877 | [2020/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117293 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725828 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/06, B60C11/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L21/00, C08L61/04, C08J9/00, C08J9/10, C08K5/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J9/103 (EP);
C08L21/00 (EP);
C08L61/04 (EP);
C08L7/00 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP);
B60C2011/145 (EP);
B60C2011/147 (EP);
C08J2307/00 (EP);
C08J2309/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L9/06, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L7/00, C08L61/12 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08L61/12, C08K3/36, C08K3/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/43] | C08J9/06, B60C11/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L21/00, C08L61/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2020/43] | English: | TIRE | [2020/43] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2020 | Translation filed | 12.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0771836 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 4, lines 37-38, 58-59; claim 8 * * page 5, line 20; table 2 * * page 7, line 8 * * page 14; examples 9-16 *; | [Y]JP2009035683 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0043]; table 5 *; | [Y]US8637606 (PILLE-WOLF WOLFGANG [BE], et al) [Y] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2014189738 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-10 * claim 4 * | International search | [XY]JP2012236951 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 7-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0016], [0020]-[0021], [0023], [0029]-[0030], [0037], examples 1-3 (Family: none) * [Y] 3, 6, 10; | [Y]JP2014234127 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 3, 10 * , paragraph [0027], examples 1, 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2017126632 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * , claims 12, paragraph [0053], example 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017203071 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2017209264 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* , entire text (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH08300904 |