EP3725604 - ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE IN CHANGING VEHICLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIO (Anhui) Holding Co., Ltd. Susong Road West, Shenzhen Road North Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui Province / CN | [2020/50] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Nio Nextev Limited 30th Floor, Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Litao 30th Floor Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
LI, Bo 30th Floor Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
SHEN, Qizhuang 30th Floor Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
SUN, Yongchao 30th Floor Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | 05 /
LIANG, Chao 30th Floor Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18887743.5 | 05.11.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018CN113919 | Priority number, date | CN201711353809 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711353809 | CN201811260617 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811260617 | [2020/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019114460 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725604 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/06, B60L3/00, B60L53/80, B60L53/66, B60L53/30, B60L53/65 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60S5/06 (CN);
B60L53/305 (EP);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/66 (EP);
B60L53/80 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | B60S5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM ZUR VERWENDUNG BEIM AUSTAUSCH EINER FAHRZEUGBATTERIE | [2020/43] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE IN CHANGING VEHICLE BATTERY | [2020/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE À UTILISER LORS DU CHANGEMENT D'UNE BATTERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2020 | Translation filed | 15.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2946305 (BOUVARD JULIEN ARMAND [FR]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-14; | [A]US2013197734 (OKURA KAZUMA [JP]) [A] 1,4,9-12,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0059]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2013342310 (PARK JUN-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1,7-12,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0061]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0122]; figure 10 * |