EP3725871 - BACTERIAL TEST PLATE HAVING ANTIBACTERIAL AGENT INTRODUCED THEREINTO, AND TRANSPARENT PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEMATSU Chihiro c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
UCHIHO Yuichi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
MASUYA Akira c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18888161.9 | 02.11.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018JP40829 | Priority number, date | JP20170238971 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017238971 | [2020/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019116775 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725871 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12M1/32, C12M1/00 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
C12M23/12 (EP);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
C12M23/20 (EP);
C12M23/22 (EP);
C12M41/36 (EP);
C12M41/46 (EP);
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP);
B01L2200/16 (EP);
B01L2300/0829 (EP);
B01L2300/0832 (US);
B01L2300/0851 (EP);
G01N2035/0418 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | C12M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE TESTPLATTE MIT DARIN EINGEFÜHRTEM ANTIBAKTERIELLEM WIRKSTOFF UND TRANSPARENTE PLATTE | [2020/43] | English: | BACTERIAL TEST PLATE HAVING ANTIBACTERIAL AGENT INTRODUCED THEREINTO, AND TRANSPARENT PLATE | [2020/43] | French: | PLAQUE D'ESSAI BACTÉRIOLOGIQUE AYANT UN AGENT ANTIBACTÉRIEN INTRODUIT DANS CELLE-CI, ET PLAQUE TRANSPARENTE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2020 | Translation filed | 05.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]BE691532 (IST SIEROTERAPICO E VACCINOGENO TOSCANO SCLAVO (ISTS)) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13 * the whole document * [I] 1-13; | [XI]WO8902927 (BIODISK AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13 * page 1 - page 3 * * figures 1, 4-6 * * claims 1-6 * [I] 1-13; | [X]WO9945095 (WARDLAW PARTNERS LP [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * claims 16, 17 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 26 * * figures 1-4 * * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 29 *; | [A]EP3202885 (QUANTA MATRIX CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-4 ** claims 1-15 *; | [XI] - JUNGIL CHOI ET AL, "Direct, rapid antimicrobial susceptibility test from positive blood cultures based on microscopic imaging analysis", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20170425), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-01278-2, XP055507839 [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * pages 2, 3 * * pages 10, 11 * [I] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-01278-2 | International search | [A]JPS52110882 (MC DONNELL DOUGLAS CORP) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [X]JPH02501349 [X] 8-13 * , & WO 1989/002927 A1, FIG.2 & EP 335866 A1 *; | [Y]JP2008523820 [Y] 1-13 * , 25, [0136], [0252], [0265], [0281], [0372] & WO 2006/066216 A2, 25, Figure 4 & US 2007/0037225 A1 & EP 1831692 A2 *; | [A]JP2010032487 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JP2010112839 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-13* , *; | [A]WO2013038925 (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * , 1, 3, 5, 7 8, [0030], [0031], [0053], [0059] & US 2014/0349333 A1 & EP 2757371 A1 *; | [X]US2015337352 (KWON SUNGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 8, 10 * , & US 2013/0196364 A1 & US 2015/0315625 A1 & US 2015/0337353 A1 *; | [XY]WO2017183875 (QUANTA MATRIX CO LTD [KR]) [X] 8-10, 12, 13 * , & KR 10-1711105 B1 * [Y] 1-13; | [PA]JP2018113963 (FUKOKU KK) [PA] 1-13 * , *; | [PX]WO2018150414 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]) [PX] 8, 9, 12, 13 * , *; | [X] - CHOI, J. et al., "Direct, rapid antimicrobial susceptibility test from positive blood cultures based on microscopic imaging analysis", Sci. Rep., (20170425), vol. 7, no. 1148, pages 1 - 13, XP055507839 [X] 8-10, 12, 13 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-01278-2 | [X] - AVESAR, J. et al., "Rapid phenotypic antimicrobial susceptibility testing using nanoliter arrays", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20170626), vol. 114, no. 29, pages E5787 - E5795, XP055618045 [X] 8, 9, 12, 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1703736114 | [A] - CHOI, J. et al., "A rapid antimicrobial susceptibility test based on single- cell morphological analysis", Sci. Transl. Med., vol. 6, no. 267, pages 1 - 13, XP055618055 [A] 1-13 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3009650 | [A] - MATSUMOTO, Y. et al., "A Microfluidic Channel Method for Rapid Drug-Susceptibility Testing of Pseudomonas aeruginosa", PLOS One, (20160000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 1 - 17, XP055340559 [A] 1-13 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0148797 |