EP3725016 - DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING SATELLITE-TO-SATELLITE RADIO LINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAR MESH LLC 22 Monterey Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLOEMER, Gerald R. PO Box 307 Round Lake, IL 60073 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18888292.2 | 05.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US64041 | Priority number, date | US201762596928P | 11.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596928 P | US201816034413 | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US201816034413 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019118245 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725016 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04B7/195, G01S19/14 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
G01S19/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04B7/18556 (IL,KR,US);
H04B7/18584 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01S19/06 (IL,KR,US);
H04B7/18519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04B7/18521 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H04B7/185, H04B7/195, H04W40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SATELLIT-ZU-SATELLIT-FUNKVERBINDUNGEN | [2020/43] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING SATELLITE-TO-SATELLITE RADIO LINKS | [2020/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES UTILISANT DES LIAISONS RADIO SATELLITE-SATELLITE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0935349 (TELEDESIC LLC [US]); | [XA]EP1024610 (GLOBALSTAR LP [US]); | [XAY]US2008170536 (MARSHACK DAVID [US], et al); | International search | [YA]US5566354 (SEHLOEMER JERRY R [US]); | [Y]EP1523062 (HERMAN PHILIPPE [FR]); | [Y]US2014177522 (MARSHACK DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2014240497 (SHEFER MORDECHAI [IL]); | [A]US2016037434 (GOPAL RAJEEV [US], et al) | by applicant | US3815140 | US5274840 | US5410728 | US5566354 | US5793842 | EP0935349 | US6208312 | US6219003 | US6459899 | US2008170536 | US7502382 | US9035839 | WO2018039292 |