EP3725426 - VIBRATING SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/43] | MECHANICAL VIBRATOR WITH A BEARING CASE FOR VIBRATING SCREENS | ||
[2023/04] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Brasil Industria e Comercio Ltda Av. Independencia, 2500 Bairro Iporanga 18087-101 Sorocaba SP / BR | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Sadao Rua Professor Souza Barros, 180 - Vila Guarani 04307-100 São Paulo - SP / BR | 02 /
REZENDE JÚNIOR, Fausto Rua Boa Esperança, 900 - Carmo 30310-730 Belo Horizonte - MG / BR | 03 /
OGAWA, Ricardo, Maerschner Avenida Três de Março, 200, QE6 Alto da Boa Vista 18087-180 Sorocaba - SP / BR | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
KATO, Sadao Rua Professor Souza Barros, 180 Vila Guarani 04307-100 São Paulo - SP / BR | ||
02 /
REZENDE JÚNIOR, Fausto Rua Boa Esperança, 900 - Carmo 30310-730 Belo Horizonte - MG / BR | |||
03 /
OGAWA, Ricardo, Maerschner Avenida Três de Março, 200, QE6 Alto da Boa Vista 18087-180 Sorocaba - SP / BR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 665 831 27 Östersund / SE | Application number, filing date | 18888894.5 | 12.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018BR50457 | Priority number, date | BR20171026766 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: BR102017026766 | [2020/43] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019113666 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | PT | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725426 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3725426 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/28, B07B1/42 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
B07B1/42 (EP,BR);
B07B1/284 (EP,US);
B07B1/282 (EP);
B07B1/38 (US);
B07B1/44 (US);
B07B1/28 (BR)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B07B1/34, B07B1/36, B07B1/44, B07B1/49, B07B1/50, B07B1/28, B07B1/42 | ||
Former IPC [2020/43] | B07B1/34, B07B1/36, B07B1/44, B07B1/49, B07B1/50, B07B1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGSIEB | [2023/04] | English: | VIBRATING SCREEN | [2023/04] | French: | TAMIS VIBRANT | [2023/04] |
Former [2020/43] | MECHANISCHER VIBRATOR MIT EINEM LAGERGEHÄUSE FÜR SCHWINGSIEBE | ||
Former [2020/43] | MECHANICAL VIBRATOR WITH A BEARING CASE FOR VIBRATING SCREENS | ||
Former [2020/43] | VIBREUR MÉCANIQUE À BOÎTIER POUR TAMIS VIBRANTS | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2020 | Translation filed | 12.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.2024
12.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Haver & Boecker Latinoamericana Máquinas Limitada Rod. Jornalista Francisco Aguirre Proença, 20km 13197-141 Monte Mor (SP) / BR Opponent's representative BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [2024/16] | 08.04.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.08.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2312477 (POLLITZ HAROLD C); | [Y]US4272366 (DEAN ARTHUR L, et al); | [Y]US4632751 (JOHNSON LOUIS W [US], et al); | [Y]CN201669210U (ANSHAN HEAVY DUTY MINING MACH) | International search | [A]US4197194 (READ JAMES L [US]); | [A]US4255254 (FAUST ELBERT R, et al); | [A]US4340469 (ARCHER FRED C); | [A]US4632751 (JOHNSON LOUIS W [US], et al); | [A]US5051171 (HUKKI ARI M [US]); | [A]US6349834 (CARR BRIAN S [US], et al) | by applicant | BRPI0602585 | BRPI1105435 | Opposition | US2312477 | DE2630458 | DE7811967U | US4197194 | US4242366 | US4255257 | US4340469 | US4632751 | US5051171 | US6349834 | CN1501845 | CN201040279Y | CN201070620Y | WO2009012922 | CN201669210U | CN201735509U | EP2176500 | DE202014008855U | CN203991284U |