EP3724903 - LITHIUM ION BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadenza Innovation, Inc. 286 Millstone Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMPE-ONNERUD, Maria, Christina 286 Millstone Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | 02 /
ONNERUD, Tord Per Jens 286 Millstone Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | 03 /
SHI, Jay 742 Main Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
SUBA, Michael 42 Marlin Road Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US | 05 /
LIPOSKY, Joshua 12 Legion Road Seymour, CT 06483 / US | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
LAMPE-ONNERUD, Maria, Christina 286 Millstone Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | ||
02 /
ONNERUD, Tord Per Jens 286 Millstone Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | |||
03 /
SHI, Jay 742 Main Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
04 /
SUBA, Michael 42 Marlin Road Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US | |||
05 /
LIPOSKY, Joshua 21 Argyle Circle Seymour, CT 06483 / US | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18888951.3 | 07.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US64479 | Priority number, date | US201715840162 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US201715840162 | US201815926433 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US201815926433 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019118295 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3724903 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/653, H01M10/0525, H01M50/30, H01M50/20, H01M50/24, H01M50/578, H01M50/579, H01M50/502 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M50/24 (EP);
H01M50/394 (EP);
H01M50/578 (EP);
H01M50/579 (EP);
H01M2200/00 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H01G11/78, H01G11/80, H01G11/10, H01G11/06, H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M2/12, H01M10/653, H01M2/34, H01M10/617, H01M10/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIE | [2020/43] | English: | LITHIUM ION BATTERY | [2020/43] | French: | BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 07.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010136404 (HERMANN WESTON ARTHUR [US], et al) [Y] 2,9 * paragraph [0031]; figure 8 *; | [Y]EP2879203 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6-8,17-19* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2015221914 (PAGE JOHN B [CA], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0075] , [0077]; figure 8 *; | [Y]US2015280185 (LAMPE-ONNERUD MARIA CHRISTINA [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0047] , [0049] , [0060] , [0061] , [0048] , [0056] , [0073]; figures 1a,1b,7a,7b *; | [Y]WO2017106349 (CADENZA INNOVATION INC [US]) [Y] 4,5 * sentence 29, paragraph 23 - sentence 31; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US2015280185 (LAMPE-ONNERUD MARIA CHRISTINA [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; figures 1A & 1B; paragraphs [0018], [0030], [0047]-[0049], [0060]-[0061], [0080] *; | [A]WO2017106349 (CADENZA INNOVATION INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * ; figure 5; page 10 line 28 to page 11, line 2; page 11 lines 14-18; page 23 lines 10-16; page 49 line 27 to page 50 line 6 *; | [A]US2017214103 (ONNERUD TORD PER JENS [US], et al) [A] 1-26* ; figures 1A & 1B; paragraphs [0035], [0037], [0092]-[0093], [0103]-[0104], [0123] * |