EP3726418 - ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Yanliu No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Shiming No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Zheng No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Weifeng No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18889260.8 | 30.11.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018CN118681 | Priority number, date | CN201711338861 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711338861 | [2020/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019114572 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726418 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06F3/041, H01L27/146, // H01L27/32 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H01L27/14625 (EP);
G06V40/1318 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0412 (CN,US);
G06F3/0416 (CN);
H01L27/14623 (EP,US);
H01L27/14636 (EP);
H01L27/14685 (US);
H10K59/60 (US);
H10K59/65 (EP,CN);
H10K71/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | G06K9/00, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | MATRIXSUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, FINGERABDRUCKERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/43] | English: | ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/43] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE RÉSEAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN106773219 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [A]CN107103307 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [A]EP3252655 (VKANSEE TECH COMPANY LTD [CN]); | US2019056613 [ ] (WANG HAISHENG [CN], et al); | US2019354789 [ ] (GU PINCHAO [CN], et al) |